There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

VET Protection Act of 2017
Veterans, Employees, and Taxpayers Protection Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

VET Protection Act of 2017
Veterans, Employees, and Taxpayers Protection Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to submit an annual report to Congress relating to the use of official time by employees of the Department of Veterans Affairs, to limit the instances in which official time may be granted for certain purposes to employees of the Department, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/23/2017Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
05/23/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-146, Part I.
03/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date All Actions
05/23/2017Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 94.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2017Committee on Oversight and Government discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
05/23/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-146, Part I.
05/17/2017Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 13 - 11.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/17/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/21/2017Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
03/20/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/20/2017Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged.
03/09/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2017Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs03/09/2017 Referred to
05/17/2017 Markup by
05/23/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-146
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity03/20/2017 Referred to
03/20/2017 Discharged from
03/21/2017 Hearings by
House Oversight and Government Reform03/09/2017 Referred to
05/23/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1461. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (05/23/2017)

Veterans, Employees, and Taxpayers Protection Act of 2017 or the VET Protection Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to: (1) track the use of official time by VA employees accurately and without the use of estimates or ranges of times, and (2) report on such use to the Office of Personnel Management and Congress by December 1 of each fiscal year.

Each report shall include: (1) the total amount of official time granted to employees; (2) the total amount of official time expended and the amount of official time expended per employee for term negotiations, mid-term negotiations, general labor-management relations, and dispute resolution; (3) the types of activities for which official time was granted and the impact on VA operations; (4) the total annual salary and job title of, and amount of official time afforded to, employees; (5) a description of any room or space designated for official time activities; and (6) a list of any employees granted a waiver and a justification for each such waiver.

"Official time" means any period of time granted to an employee under federal labor-management provisions to perform representational or consultative functions during which the employee would otherwise be in a duty status.

The bill prohibits a VA employee from using official time to carry out political or lobbying activities;

The following VA employees may not use official time for any purpose: (1) a physician, dentist, podiatrist, chiropractor, or optometrist; (2) an employee with an annual basic pay rate of $100,000 or more; and (3) an employee serving a probationary period. Any other VA employee may not spend more than 25% of his or her duty status time on official time.

The VA may waive such official time restrictions if reasonable, necessary, and in the best interest of veterans. Such waiver authority shall not be subject to collective bargaining, and the exercise or failure to exercise such authority shall not be an unfair labor practice.

An exclusive bargaining agreement entered into by the VA shall allow a VA employee to terminate a voluntary allotment for the payment of dues at any time.

The appointment of a covered VA employee shall become final only after such employee has served a two-year probationary period. "Covered employee:" (1) means any individual appointed to a permanent position within the competitive service or as a career appointee within the Senior Executive Service, and (2) does not include any individual appointed to a VA health care position for which a two-year probationary period applies. Such an employee's supervisor shall determine whether the employee's appointment becomes final not later than 90 days before the expiration of such probationary period.