There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Recognizing America's Children Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the cancellation of removal and adjustment of status of certain aliens who are long-term United States residents and who entered the United States as children, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date All Actions
03/22/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/22/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/21/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/09/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2017Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Homeland Security, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (34)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Gonzalez-Colon, Jenniffer [R-PR-At Large]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/09/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 03/10/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 03/15/2017
Rep. Taylor, Scott [R-VA-2] 03/16/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 04/04/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 04/06/2017
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 04/26/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 06/23/2017
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 08/01/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/05/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 09/05/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/06/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/06/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 09/06/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/06/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/06/2017
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/06/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 09/06/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 09/07/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 09/07/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 09/12/2017
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/13/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 09/14/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 09/26/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/28/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 11/15/2017
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Cosponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 04/05/2017 05/10/2018 H3912

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/09/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security03/21/2017 Referred to
House Homeland Security03/09/2017 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security03/22/2017 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Counterterrorism and Intelligence03/22/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services03/09/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1468. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/09/2017)

Recognizing America's Children Act

This bill authorizes the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to cancel the removal of, and adjust to conditional nonimmigrant for an initial five-year period the status of, an alien who:

  • was younger than 16 years old when he or she initially entered the United States and has been physically present in the United States since January 1, 2012;
  • is a person of good moral character;
  • is not inadmissible or deportable on specified grounds under the Immigration and Nationality Act;
  • has not participated in the persecution of any person on account of race, religion, nationality, membership in a particular social group, or political opinion;
  • has not been convicted of certain offenses under federal or state law;
  • is 18 years or older and has earned a high school diploma, general education development certificate, or high school equivalency diploma in the United States, has been admitted to an institution of higher education, or has a valid work authorization; and
  • has never been under a final order of exclusion, deportation, or removal unless the alien has remained in the United States under color of law after such order's issuance or received the order before attaining the age of 18.

An alien applying for relief under this bill shall: (1) register under the Military Selective Service Act if so required, (2) undergo a medical examination, (3) submit biometric and biographic data, and (4) complete security and law enforcement background checks.

DHS shall under specified circumstances terminate or extend the conditional nonimmigrant status of an alien who is at least 18 years old.

A conditional nonimmigrant may file an application to adjust his or her status to that of an alien lawfully admitted for permanent residence during a specified period.

An alien who adjusts to permanent resident status may apply for naturalization upon compliance with all immigration law requirements.