There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Social Worker Safety Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of Health and Human Services to award grants to States to provide safety measures to social workers and other similar professionals who work with at-risk populations, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/09/2017Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/09/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21]* 03/09/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 05/01/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/08/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/13/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 03/06/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce03/09/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1484.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1484. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/09/2017)

Social Worker Safety Act of 2017

This bill allows the Department of Health and Human Services to award grants to states for providing safety measures to social workers and other similar professionals working with violent, illicit drug-using, or other at-risk populations.