There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Securing American Non-Profit Organizations Against Terrorism Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Securing American Non-Profit Organizations Against Terrorism Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Securing American Non-Profit Organizations Against Terrorism Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to provide funding to secure non-profit facilities from terrorist attacks, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/09/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H38)
01/09/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-495.
03/09/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/10/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
01/09/2018-1:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/09/2018-1:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H38)
01/09/2018-1:08pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1486.
01/09/2018-1:08pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H38-40)
01/09/2018-1:08pmHouseMr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
01/09/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 368.
01/09/2018HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-495.
12/13/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
12/13/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
12/13/2017HouseSubcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications Discharged.
03/22/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response and Communications.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/09/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/09/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (16)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Homeland Security03/09/2017 Referred to
12/13/2017 Markup by
01/09/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-495
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Communications03/22/2017 Referred to
12/13/2017 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs01/10/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1486.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1486. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (01/09/2018)

Securing American Non-Profit Organizations Against Terrorism Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to establish a Non-Profit Security Grant Program in the Department of Homeland Security, under which the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) shall make grants to tax-exempt, nonprofit organizations determined to be at risk of a terrorist attack, through the state in which such organizations are located, for target hardening and other security enhancements to protect against terrorist attacks.

Recipients may use grants for:

  • target hardening activities, including physical security enhancement equipment and inspection and screening systems;
  • fees for security training relating to physical security and cyber security, target hardening, terrorism awareness, and employee awareness; and
  • any other appropriate activity, including cyber security resilience activities.

FEMA shall: (1) make funds provided available for use by a recipient of a grant for a period of not less than 36 months, and (2) report to Congress annually for each of FY2018-FY2022 on the expenditure by each recipient of grant funds made under the Act. Appropriations are authorized for those years to carry out the program, with a specified amount designated for: (1) recipients located in jurisdictions that receive funding under the Urban Area Security Initiative, and (2) recipients located in other jurisdictions.