There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Juror Non-Discrimination Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 28, United States Code, to prohibit the exclusion of individuals from service on a Federal jury on account of sexual orientation or gender identity.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/13/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/31/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/13/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/13/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (84)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 03/13/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/21/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/21/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/21/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/21/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 03/22/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/28/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/28/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 03/28/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 03/29/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 04/26/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/06/2017
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 06/12/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 06/13/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 06/23/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 07/28/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 08/08/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 09/26/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 10/24/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 10/31/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 11/02/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 11/16/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 11/16/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/14/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/27/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/06/2018
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/07/2018
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/31/2018
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 09/12/2018
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 09/12/2018
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 09/12/2018
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/12/2018
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 09/12/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 09/12/2018
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/12/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/12/2018
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/12/2018
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/13/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 09/13/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 09/13/2018
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 09/13/2018
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 09/13/2018
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/13/2018
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 09/13/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/13/2018
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/13/2018
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 09/13/2018
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 09/13/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 09/13/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 09/17/2018
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/17/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/17/2018
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/17/2018
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 09/17/2018
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 09/20/2018
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/20/2018
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 09/20/2018
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12] 09/20/2018
Rep. Lamb, Conor [D-PA-18] 09/24/2018
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 09/24/2018
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/24/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 09/25/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 09/25/2018
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 09/28/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/02/2018
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7] 10/12/2018
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/19/2018
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 10/26/2018
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 11/14/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/13/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice03/31/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1515. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/13/2017)

Juror Non-Discrimination Act of 2017

This bill amends the federal judicial code to prohibit the exclusion of citizens from service as a grand or petit juror in U.S. district courts or the Court of International Trade on account of sexual orientation or gender identity (thereby expanding the current prohibition against exclusion on account of race, color, religion, sex, national origin, or economic status).