There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Honoring Our WWII Merchant Mariners Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish the Merchant Mariner Equity Compensation Fund to provide benefits to certain individuals who served in the United States merchant marine (including the Army Transport Service and the Naval Transport Service) during World War II.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
01/19/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
01/03/2017Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (55)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/02/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/04/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/16/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/16/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/16/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/16/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/16/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/16/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/17/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/17/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/17/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/17/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/17/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/07/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 06/07/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/07/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/07/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 06/07/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/11/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/14/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/24/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 07/24/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 07/24/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 08/04/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/05/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/05/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 09/05/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/05/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 09/14/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16] 09/26/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/28/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 10/24/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/24/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 10/24/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/07/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/10/2018
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/08/2018
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 05/16/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/24/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 05/24/2018
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/24/2018
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 06/07/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/13/2018
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/20/2018
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/20/2018
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 06/20/2018
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/20/2018
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/25/2018
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/25/2018
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 06/27/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/13/2018
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 11/28/2018
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/10/2018
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/10/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs01/03/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs01/19/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.154.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.154. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2017)

Honoring Our WWII Merchant Mariners Act of 2017

This bill establishes in the Treasury the Merchant Mariner Equity Compensation Fund from which the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) is to make one payment of $25,000 to each individual who, between December 7, 1941, and December 31, 1946, was a documented member of the U.S. merchant marine (including the Army Transport Service and the Naval Transport Service) serving as a crewmember of a vessel that was operated in U.S. waters by the War Shipping Administration or the Office of Defense Transportation and under contract to, or the property of, the United States. Such individuals must: (1) apply for such benefit within one year after the enactment of this Act, and (2) not have received benefits under the Servicemen's Readjustment Act of 1944.

The VA shall include, in annual budget documents submitted to Congress, detailed information on the Fund's operation.