There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Udall Park Land Exchange Completion Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Udall Park Land Exchange Completion Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Udall Park Land Exchange Completion Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Udall Park Land Exchange Completion Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the unencumbering of title to non-Federal land owned by the city of Tucson, Arizona, for purposes of economic development by conveyance of the Federal reversionary interest to the City.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
07/23/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-307.
10/02/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 544).(text: CR H7641)
08/29/2017Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-280.
03/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/23/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 526.
07/23/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 115-307.
05/17/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
02/07/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 115-502.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining
10/03/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
10/02/2017-6:52pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/02/2017-6:52pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 0 (Roll no. 544). (text: CR H7641)
10/02/2017-6:31pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7650-7651)
10/02/2017-5:14pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/02/2017-5:07pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1547.
10/02/2017-5:07pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7641-7642)
10/02/2017-5:07pmHouseMr. Thompson (PA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
08/29/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 200.
08/29/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-280.
07/26/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/26/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
07/14/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands
03/24/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/15/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/15/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/15/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
08/29/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-280
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands03/24/2017 Referred to
07/14/2017 Hearings by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources10/03/2017 Referred to
05/17/2018 Markup by
07/23/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-307
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining02/07/2018 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1547. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (10/02/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Udall Park Land Exchange Completion Act

(Sec. 3) This bill directs the Department of the Interior to convey, without consideration, to the city of Tucson, Arizona, the reversionary interest of the United States in and to an approximately 172.8-acre parcel of land owned by the city for the purpose of unencumbering the title to such land to enable its economic development.