Committees: H.R.1547 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/15/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
08/29/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-280
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands03/24/2017 Referred to
07/14/2017 Hearings by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources10/03/2017 Referred to
05/17/2018 Markup by
07/23/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-307
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining02/07/2018 Hearings by