There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (17)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Orrin G. Hatch-Bob Goodlatte Music Modernization Act

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill
  • AMP Act
  • Allocation for Music Producers Act
  • Classics Protection and Access Act
  • Musical Works Modernization Act

Other Short Titles

Orrin G. Hatch Music Modernization Act

Other Short Titles for portions of a bill
  • AMP Act
  • Allocation for Music Producers Act
  • Classics Protection and Access Act
  • Musical Works Modernization Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Orrin G. Hatch Music Modernization Act

Short Titles as Passed Senate for portions of this bill
  • AMP Act
  • Allocation for Music Producers Act
  • Classics Protection and Access Act
  • Musical Works Modernization Act

Official Titles

Official Title as Agreed to by House and Senate

An Act to modernize copyright law, and for other purposes.

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to modify the credit for production from advanced nuclear power facilities.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-264.
10/11/2018Signed by President.
10/04/2018Presented to President.
09/25/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.
09/18/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
06/20/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4958)
06/20/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-183.
03/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (28)

Date Chamber
10/11/2018Became Public Law No: 115-264.
10/11/2018Signed by President.
10/04/2018HousePresented to President.
09/28/2018-10:15amHouseCorrect Enrollment
09/25/2018-7:17pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/25/2018-7:17pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8822-8837)
09/25/2018-7:17pmHouseMr. Collins (GA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H8822-8838)
09/20/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/18/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
09/18/2018SenateS.Amdt.4022 Amendment SA 4022 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/18/2018SenateS.Amdt.4021 Amendment SA 4021 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/18/2018SenateS.Amdt.4021 Amendment SA 4021 proposed by Senator Hatch for Senator Alexander to Amendment SA 4022. (consideration: CR S6259) To amend the short title.
09/18/2018SenateS.Amdt.4022 Amendment SA 4022 proposed by Senator Hatch. (consideration: CR S6259) In the nature of a substitute.
09/18/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6259)
02/06/2018SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 300.
02/05/2018SenateRead the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
06/21/2017SenateReceived in the Senate.
06/20/2017-5:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/20/2017-4:59pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4958)
06/20/2017-4:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1551.
06/20/2017-4:27pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4958-4963)
06/20/2017-4:27pmHouseMr. Rice (SC) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
06/20/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 124.
06/20/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-183.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/15/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
06/15/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/15/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
03/15/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/15/2017 Referred to
06/15/2017 Markup by
06/20/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-183

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1551. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/20/2017)

(Sec. 1) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the tax credit for the production of electricity from advanced nuclear power facilities, to: (1) establish requirements for the allocation of unutilized portions of the national megawatt capacity limitation, and (2) allow public entities to transfer the credit to project partners.

If a portion of the 6,000 national megawatt capacity limitation for the credit is unutilized after December 31, 2020, the Internal Revenue Service must allocate the unutilized capacity: (1) first to facilities that were placed in service on or before December 31, 2020, and did not receive an allocation equal to their full nameplate capacity, and (2) then to facilities placed in service after December 31, 2020, in the order in which the facilities are placed in service. The placed-in-service sunset date of January 1, 2021, does not apply to the allocations of unutilized national megawatt capacity.

Qualified public entities may transfer the credit to an eligible project partner. A "qualified public entity" is: (1) a federal, state, or local government or any political subdivision, agency, or instrumentality thereof; (2) a mutual or cooperative electric company; or (3) a not-for-profit electric utility which has or had received a loan or loan guarantee under the Rural Electrification Act of 1936.

An "eligible project partner" includes any person who: (1) is responsible for, or is participating in, the design or construction of the facility; (2) participates in the provision of nuclear steam or nuclear fuel to the facility; or (3) has an ownership interest in the facility.