There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

FOCA Act
Fair and Open Competition Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To preserve open competition and Federal Government neutrality towards the labor relations of Federal Government contractors on Federal and federally funded construction projects, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/15/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
03/28/2017Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/28/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/15/2017Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/15/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (94)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 03/21/2017
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 03/21/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 03/22/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 03/24/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/24/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/24/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 03/24/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6] 03/24/2017
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 03/24/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 03/27/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/27/2017
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/27/2017
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 03/27/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 03/27/2017
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 03/27/2017
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 03/28/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/28/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 03/28/2017
Rep. Walters, Mimi [R-CA-45] 03/28/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/28/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/30/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/30/2017
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 03/30/2017
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 03/30/2017
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 04/03/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/03/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 04/03/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 04/03/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 04/03/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 04/03/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/03/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 04/03/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/03/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/06/2017
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/06/2017
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 04/20/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 04/20/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 04/26/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 05/01/2017
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 05/02/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 05/11/2017
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/16/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/16/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/25/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 06/07/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 06/08/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 06/13/2017
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/15/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/22/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/22/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/22/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 06/22/2017
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 06/23/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/23/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 06/26/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/26/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/27/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 06/27/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 07/10/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/11/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/27/2017
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3] 09/06/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 09/13/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 09/25/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/02/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/04/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 10/04/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/05/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 10/05/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 10/11/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/25/2017
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 10/31/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 11/02/2017
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 11/06/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 11/07/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19] 11/28/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 12/01/2017
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 12/04/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 12/07/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 12/11/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 12/11/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 12/11/2017
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 12/12/2017
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 01/09/2018
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 02/07/2018
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 02/27/2018
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 04/27/2018
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/28/2018
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/28/2018
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 07/12/2018
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/17/2018
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/17/2018
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 07/18/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform03/15/2017 Referred to
03/28/2017 Markup by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1552. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/15/2017)

Fair and Open Competition Act or FOCA Act

This bill prohibits a federal executive agency that awards any construction contract after the enactment of this bill from requiring or prohibiting a contract bidder from entering into agreements with labor organizations (i.e., Project Labor Agreements [PLAs]) or otherwise discriminating against a bidder or contractor who signs, or refuses to sign, a PLA.

Agencies that award grants, provide financial assistance, or enter into cooperative agreements for construction projects after the enactment of this bill must ensure that the bid specifications, project agreements, or other controlling documents for such projects do not contain any requirements or prohibitions relating to PLAs.

An agency may exempt a particular project or grant from the prohibition of this bill if it determines that special circumstances exist requiring an exemption to avert an imminent threat to public health or safety or to serve the national security.