There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Stop Militarizing Law Enforcement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 10, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of Defense to make certain limitations on the transfer of personal property to Federal and State agencies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
04/05/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Action By: Committee on Armed Services
03/16/2017Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2017Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2094)
Action By: House of Representatives
03/16/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (38)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Amash, Justin [R-MI-3]* 03/16/2017
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 03/16/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/16/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/21/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/06/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/01/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/01/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/01/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/01/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/01/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 09/01/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/01/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/01/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 09/01/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/01/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/07/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/07/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/07/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/19/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/03/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 10/02/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Armed Services03/16/2017 Referred to
House Armed Services Subcommittee on Readiness04/05/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1556.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1556. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/16/2017)

Stop Militarizing Law Enforcement Act

This bill revises the authority of the Department of Defense (DOD) to transfer excess personal property to federal and state law enforcement agencies.

DOD's authority to transfer property for counter-drug activities is eliminated.

DOD property recipients must: (1) provide DOD with a description of intended use; and (2) certify that they have appropriate personnel, technical capacity, and training and will return any surplus DOD property.

Non-federal recipients must certify that they have notified their local community of requests for DOD property.

The following transfers are prohibited:

  • controlled firearms, ammunition, grenades, and explosives;
  • controlled vehicles, certain trucks, and other highly mobile or mine-resistant ambush-protected vehicles;
  • armored or weaponized drones;
  • controlled aircraft that are combat configured or combat coded, or that have no established commercial flight application;
  • silencers;
  • long range acoustic devices; and
  • items in the Federal Supply Class of banned items.

Transfers conditioned upon the agency demonstrating the use of any small arms or ammunitions are prohibited.

Transfers of previously transferred DOD property from one federal or state agency to another such agency are prohibited.

DOD may waive transfer prohibitions for certain trucks and vehicles (other than mine-resistant ambush-protected vehicles) if necessary for disasters, rescues, or other purposes where life and public safety are at risk.

DOD shall require as a condition of any property transfer that the recipient agency shall return the property if the agency is: (1) investigated by the Department of Justice for any violation of civil liberties, or (2) otherwise found to have engaged in widespread abuses of civil liberties.

Obligations or expenditures of appropriations to carry out DOD's property transfer program are prohibited unless specified conditions are met.

Federal or state agencies that receive controlled property may not take ownership of such property.