There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

United States-Mexico Economic Partnership Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote economic partnership and cooperation between the United States and Mexico.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/27/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9591)
03/16/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
11/28/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
11/27/2018-5:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/27/2018-5:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H9591)
11/27/2018-4:56pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1567.
11/27/2018-4:56pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9591-9593)
11/27/2018-4:55pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/27/2018HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules, by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/18/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/16/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
03/16/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 05/16/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 10/16/2018
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 10/16/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 10/16/2018
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/27/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/16/2017 Referred to
09/27/2018 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere05/18/2017 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations11/28/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1567.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1567. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/16/2017)

United States-Mexico Economic Partnership Act

This bill declares that it shall be U.S. policy to increase U.S.-Mexico academic exchanges at the secondary, post-secondary, and post-graduate levels. The United States and Mexico should seek to contribute to doubling the number of students studying in each other's country within five years.

Priority should be given to strengthening ties between communities and academic institutions in those portions of the United States and Mexico that are within 100 kilometers of the international boundary between those countries.

The President shall develop a plan to implement policies and programs that support cooperation, training, and mentoring of entrepreneurs. Such policies and programs should seek to provide not less than 100 grants of not more than $25,000 each for program participants to better leverage participation by the private sector.

The President shall develop a plan to implement policies and programs that promote U.S.-Mexico energy infrastructure coordination and cooperation through support of vocational-level education, internships, and exchanges between the two countries. Such policies and programs should seek to provide education, internships, and exchanges for at least 1,000 program participants.

The President shall develop a plan to implement a pilot program to develop a pipeline between undergraduate colleges and universities in the United States and medical school programs in Mexico. Such program should be utilized to prepare medical students to become doctors who can pass U.S. medical licensing board exams. The pilot program should seek to increase the number of bilingual medical professionals in a cost-effective manner who can practice in U.S. underserved communities.