There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

DOC Access Act
Dentist and Optometric Care Access Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XXVII of the Public Health Service Act to improve health care coverage under vision and dental plans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
03/17/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
03/24/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/17/2017Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/17/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (105)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/17/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/17/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 03/17/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4]* 03/17/2017
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 03/17/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 04/28/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 04/28/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/28/2017
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 04/28/2017
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/28/2017
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/28/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/16/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/16/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/16/2017
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 05/17/2017
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/06/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 06/06/2017
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 06/12/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 06/22/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/22/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/22/2017
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 06/22/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 06/22/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/26/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 06/26/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/26/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 06/27/2017
Rep. Arrington, Jodey C. [R-TX-19] 06/27/2017
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 06/27/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 06/27/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 06/28/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 07/06/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 07/06/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 07/10/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/13/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 07/13/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/17/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/17/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/18/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/18/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/19/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 07/24/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/24/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 07/24/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/26/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/26/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/27/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 07/27/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 07/27/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 08/04/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 09/07/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/11/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 09/11/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 09/12/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 09/25/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/27/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 10/19/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/19/2017
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 10/25/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 11/06/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 11/15/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 11/29/2017
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 11/29/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 12/06/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 12/18/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 12/20/2017
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 12/21/2017
Rep. Newhouse, Dan [R-WA-4] 01/10/2018
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 01/11/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 01/16/2018
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 01/16/2018
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 01/19/2018
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 01/29/2018
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/29/2018
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 03/01/2018
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/01/2018
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 03/19/2018
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 04/11/2018
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 04/11/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 04/12/2018
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 04/12/2018
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 04/12/2018
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 04/24/2018
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 04/24/2018
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 04/24/2018
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/24/2018
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 04/24/2018
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 04/24/2018
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 04/24/2018
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/24/2018
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 04/24/2018
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/25/2018
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/27/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/08/2018
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 05/08/2018
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 06/06/2018
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 06/06/2018
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 06/08/2018
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/13/2018
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/25/2018
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/27/2018
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 07/11/2018
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/11/2018
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/02/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/02/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/17/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/24/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1606.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1606. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/17/2017)

Dentist and Optometric Care Access Act or the DOC Access Act

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to prohibit group health plans and individual health insurance coverage from setting rates for items and services provided by a doctor of optometry, of dental surgery, or of dental medicine for which the plan or insurer does not pay a substantial amount.

An agreement between a plan or insurer and such a doctor: (1) may only be changed with the doctor's acknowledgement and acceptance, and (2) may last longer than two years only with the prior acceptance of the doctor for each term extension if the agreement is for limited scope dental or vision benefits.

Such a doctor must be allowed to participate in: (1) a plan or coverage without accepting terms for ancillary services or procedures, and (2) a provider network without participating in a specific limited scope dental or vision benefit plan.

Plans and insurers may not: (1) directly communicate with an enrolled individual in a manner that interferes with an existing doctor-patient relationship or a state or federal requirement, or (2) restrict such a doctor's choice of laboratories or suppliers.

The bill establishes a private right of action for a person adversely affected by a violation of this bill.

The bill is preempted by state laws regarding health insurers and dental or vision benefit plans.