There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Iranian Leadership Asset Transparency Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Iranian Leadership Asset Transparency Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Iranian Leadership Asset Transparency Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Secretary of the Treasury to submit a report to the appropriate congressional committees on the estimated total assets under direct or indirect control by certain senior Iranian leaders and other figures, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
12/13/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 289 - 135 (Roll no. 680).
12/07/2017Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
12/07/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-453, Part I.
03/20/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (30)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/14/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
12/13/2017-5:27pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/13/2017-5:27pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 289 - 135 (Roll no. 680).
12/13/2017-5:20pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9879-9880)
12/13/2017-4:20pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 1638, the Chair put the question on passage and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Hensarling demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of passage until later in the legislative day.
12/13/2017-4:19pmHouseThe House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H9875-9876)
12/13/2017-4:19pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
12/13/2017-4:18pmHouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1638.
12/13/2017-4:17pmHouseH.Amdt.499 On agreeing to the Meng amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
12/13/2017-4:14pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 658, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Meng Part A amendment No. 2.
12/13/2017-4:13pmHouseH.Amdt.499 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Meng. (consideration: CR H9877-9878; text: CR H9877)
12/13/2017-4:13pmHouseH.Amdt.498 On agreeing to the Schneider amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
12/13/2017-4:05pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 658, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Schneider Part A amendment No. 1.
12/13/2017-4:05pmHouseH.Amdt.498 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Schneider. (consideration: CR H9876-9877; text: CR H9867)
12/13/2017-2:57pmHouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1638.
12/13/2017-2:57pmHouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 658 and Rule XVIII.
12/13/2017-2:57pmHouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable Paul Mitchell to act as Chairman of the Committee.
12/13/2017-2:56pmHousePrevious question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on each bill. It also makes in order specified amendments for the bills.
12/13/2017-2:56pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 658. (consideration: CR H9868-9878)
12/12/2017-4:55pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 658 Reported to House. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on each bill. It also makes in order specified amendments for the bills.
12/07/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 335.
12/07/2017HouseCommittee on Foreign Affairs discharged.
12/07/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-453, Part I.
11/14/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 43 - 16.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
11/14/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
05/18/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
03/20/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/20/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/20/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/20/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/20/2017 Referred to
11/14/2017 Markup by
12/07/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-453
House Foreign Affairs03/20/2017 Referred to
12/07/2017 Discharged from
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Middle East and North Africa05/18/2017 Referred to
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs12/14/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1638. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/13/2017)

Iranian Leadership Asset Transparency Act

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the Department of the Treasury, in furtherance of efforts to prevent terrorism financing, money laundering, or illicit finance and to make financial institutions' sanctions compliance more easily understood, to report to Congress within 270 days and annually thereafter for the next two years regarding:

  • the funds or assets held in U.S. and foreign financial institutions that are controlled by specified Iranian officials;
  • any equity stake such official has in an entity on Treasury's list of Specially Designated Nationals or in any other sanctioned entity;
  • how such funds, assets, or equity interests were acquired and used;
  • new methods used to evade anti-money laundering and related laws, including recommendations to improve techniques to combat illicit uses of the U.S. financial system by each such official;
  • recommendations for revising U.S. economic sanctions against Iran to prevent Iranian officials from using funds or assets to develop and procure ballistic missile technology;
  • how Treasury assesses the effectiveness of U.S. economic sanctions against Iran; and
  • recommendations for improving Treasury's ability to develop and enforce additional economic sanctions against Iran.

The unclassified portion of the report shall be made available to the public and posted on Treasury's website in downloadable English, Farsi, Arabic, and Azeri versions.

(Sec. 4) It is the sense of Congress that in preparing the reports pursuant to this bill Treasury should consider acquiring information from sources that: (1) collect high-veracity official records; or (2) provide search and analysis tools that enable law enforcement to have new insights into commercial and financial relationships.