There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

National Nurse Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the same individual serving as the Chief Nurse Officer of the Public Health Service as the National Nurse for Public Health.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/21/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
03/24/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: House Energy and Commerce
03/21/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/21/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/21/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/04/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/04/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 04/04/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/04/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/04/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/25/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/25/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/25/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/25/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/26/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 04/26/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/27/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/27/2017
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/02/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/02/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 05/16/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 05/22/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/22/2017
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/24/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/24/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/07/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/07/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/20/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/20/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 06/22/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/21/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/24/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (9)

  • Department of Health and Human Services
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Federal officials
  • Health information and medical records
  • Health personnel
  • Health promotion and preventive care
  • Nursing
  • Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1651. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/21/2017)

National Nurse Act of 2017

This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Department of Health and Human Services to designate the Chief Nurse Officer of the Public Health Service as the National Nurse for Public Health.

The duties of this position include: (1) providing leadership and coordination of Public Health Service nursing professional affairs for the Office of the Surgeon General and other agencies of the Public Health Service, (2) conducting outreach and education, and (3) providing guidance and leadership for activities that will increase public safety and emergency preparedness.

The National Nurse for Public Health must: (1) participate in identification of national health priorities, (2) encourage volunteerism of nurses and strengthen the relationship between government agencies and health-related national organizations, and (3) promote the dissemination of evidence-based practice in educating the public on health promotion and disease prevention activities.