There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Global Health Innovation Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Global Health Innovation Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Global Health Innovation Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Global Health Innovation Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Global Health Innovation Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Administrator of the United States Agency for International Development to submit to Congress a report on the development and use of global health innovations in the programs, projects, and activities of the Agency.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
01/03/2019Became Public Law No: 115-411.
01/03/2019Signed by President.
12/27/2018Presented to President.
12/20/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8002)
03/22/2018Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report.
01/18/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 3 (Roll no. 34).(text: CR 1/17/2018 H439)
03/21/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
01/03/2019Became Public Law No: 115-411.
01/03/2019Signed by President.
12/27/2018HousePresented to President.
12/21/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/20/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8002)
03/22/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 364.
03/22/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report.
03/20/2018SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/19/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
01/18/2018-7:44pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
01/18/2018-7:44pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 3 (Roll no. 34). (text: CR 1/17/2018 H439)
01/18/2018-7:37pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H538-539)
01/17/2018-2:45pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
01/17/2018-2:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1660.
01/17/2018-2:36pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H439-440)
01/17/2018-2:36pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/28/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/28/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/21/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
03/21/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/21/2017 Referred to
09/28/2017 Markup by
Senate Foreign Relations01/19/2018 Referred to
03/20/2018 Markup by
03/22/2018 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1660.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1660. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-411 (01/03/2019)

Global Health Innovation Act of 2017

This bill directs the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) to report to Congress, annually for four years, on the development and use of global health innovations in USAID programs, projects, and activities.

Such reports shall include topics including: (1) USAID's health product development goals and progress towards their achievement; (2) how innovation has advanced USAID's commitments to achieving an HIV/AIDS-free generation, ending preventable child and maternal deaths, and protecting communities from infectious diseases; (3) how USAID, alone and in partnerships, is leveraging U.S. investments to achieve greater health innovation; and (4) coordination with other federal departments.