There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Affordable Housing Credit Improvement Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to reform the low-income housing credit, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/21/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/21/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/21/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (122)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Faso, John J. [R-NY-19]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 03/21/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/24/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/24/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/24/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 03/27/2017
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 03/29/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/29/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 03/29/2017
Rep. Gonzalez, Vicente [D-TX-15] 04/03/2017
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 04/05/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 04/17/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 04/17/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/17/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/25/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/25/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/25/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 04/26/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 04/27/2017
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 05/03/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/03/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/11/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/11/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 05/11/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 05/16/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/16/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 05/18/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/23/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/06/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/06/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/06/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/07/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 06/08/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/08/2017
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 06/08/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/08/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/12/2017
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/12/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/13/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 06/15/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 06/20/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 06/21/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/21/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 06/21/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/22/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/22/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 06/23/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/27/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/27/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/27/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/27/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 06/28/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/29/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/29/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/11/2017
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/11/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 07/11/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 07/12/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/12/2017
Rep. Taylor, Scott [R-VA-2] 07/17/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 07/24/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/27/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/27/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/27/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 07/28/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 08/04/2017
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 08/04/2017
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 08/15/2017
Rep. Young, David [R-IA-3] 08/15/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 08/15/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 08/15/2017
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 08/25/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 09/05/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 09/05/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 09/05/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 09/05/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 09/07/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/12/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 09/12/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 09/12/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 09/12/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/25/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 09/25/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/25/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/25/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/28/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 10/04/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 10/04/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 10/12/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 10/12/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46] 10/12/2017
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/12/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/12/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 10/23/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 10/23/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/23/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/23/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 10/26/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 10/26/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 10/26/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 10/26/2017
Rep. Gomez, Jimmy [D-CA-34] 10/31/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 11/02/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/02/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 11/02/2017
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 11/06/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 11/14/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means03/21/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (13)

  • Alternative and renewable resources
  • Building construction
  • Business investment and capital
  • Energy efficiency and conservation
  • Housing finance and home ownership
  • Housing supply and affordability
  • Income tax credits
  • Indian social and development programs
  • Low- and moderate-income housing
  • Residential rehabilitation and home repair
  • Securities
  • State and local finance

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1661. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/21/2017)

Affordable Housing Credit Improvement Act of 2017

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the low-income housing credit, to rename the credit "the affordable housing credit" and make several modifications to the credit.

The bill revises tenant eligibility requirements, with respect to:

  • the average income test,
  • income eligibility for rural projects,
  • increased tenant income,
  • student occupancy rules, and
  • tenant voucher payments that are taken into account as rent.

The bill revises various requirements to:

  • establish a 4% minimum credit rate for certain projects,
  • permit relocation costs to be taken into account as rehabilitation expenditures,
  • repeal the qualified census tract population cap,
  • require housing credit agencies to make certain determinations regarding community revitalization plans,
  • prohibit local approval and contribution requirements,
  • increase the credit for certain projects designated to serve extremely low-income households,
  • increase the credit for certain bond-financed projects designated by state agencies,
  • increase the population cap for difficult development areas, and
  • eliminate the basis reduction for a property that receives the tax credit for investments in energy property if the affordable housing credit is allowed for the property.

The bill also modifies requirements regarding the reconstruction or replacement period after a casualty loss, rights related to building purchases, the prohibition on claiming acquisition credits for properties placed in service in the previous 10 years, foreclosures, and projects that assist Native Americans.