There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Disaster Declaration Improvement Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Disaster Declaration Improvement Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Disaster Declaration Improvement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that Administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency considers severe local impact in making a recommendation to the President for a major disaster declaration.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/03/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 425 - 0 (Roll no. 248).(text: CR 5/02/2017 H3019)
04/28/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-99.
03/22/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
05/04/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
05/03/2017-2:24pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/03/2017-2:24pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 425 - 0 (Roll no. 248). (text: CR 5/02/2017 H3019)
05/03/2017-2:15pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3089)
05/02/2017-1:43pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Barletta objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
05/02/2017-1:24pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1665.
05/02/2017-1:24pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3019-3022)
05/02/2017-1:24pmHouseMr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/28/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 56.
04/28/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-99.
03/29/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
03/29/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/29/2017HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
03/23/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/22/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
03/22/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 03/28/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12] 03/28/2017
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/28/2017
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 03/28/2017
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6] 03/30/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/26/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/22/2017 Referred to
03/29/2017 Markup by
04/28/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-99
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management03/23/2017 Referred to
03/29/2017 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/04/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1665. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/03/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on April 28, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Disaster Declaration Improvement Act

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA), in making recommendations to the President regarding a major disaster declaration, to give greater weight and consideration to severe local impact or recent multiple disasters.