There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

National Landslide Preparedness Act

Short Titles as Introduced

National Landslide Preparedness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a national program to identify and reduce losses from landslide hazards, to establish a national 3D Elevation Program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
12/28/2018Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
11/16/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1035, Part I.
03/22/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date All Actions
12/28/2018Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 859.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/28/2018Committee on Science, Space, and Technology discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/16/2018House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 28, 2018.
Action By: House of Representatives
11/16/2018Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-1035, Part I.
12/13/2017Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/13/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/12/2017Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
12/12/2017Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
11/30/2017Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources
04/25/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Action By: Committee on Science, Space, and Technology
03/29/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/22/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/22/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/22/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/22/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/22/2017 Referred to
12/12/2017 Markup by
12/13/2017 Markup by
11/16/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1035
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources03/29/2017 Referred to
11/30/2017 Hearings by
12/12/2017 Discharged from
House Science, Space, and Technology03/22/2017 Referred to
12/28/2018 Discharged from
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Environment04/25/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1675. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/22/2017)

National Landslide Preparedness Act

This bill: (1) directs the U.S. Geological Survey (USGS) to establish a National Landslide Hazards Reduction Program to identify and understand landslide hazards and risks, reduce losses from landslides, protect communities at risk of landslide hazards, and help improve communication and emergency preparedness; and (2) establishes the Interagency Coordinating Committee on Landslide Hazards to oversee the program.

The USGS shall:

  • develop and publish a national strategy for landslide hazards and risk reduction in the United States;
  • develop and maintain a publicly accessible national landslide hazard and risk inventory database;
  • disseminate landslide planning and risk reduction materials;
  • expand the early warning system for flash floods and debris flow;
  • establish emergency response procedures for the rapid deployment of federal scientists, equipment, and services to areas impacted by a significant landslide event;
  • support emergency response efforts and improve the safety of emergency responders
  • establish the Advisory Committee on Landslides; and
  • support the identification, mapping, research, and monitoring of subsidence and groundwater resource accounting.

The USGS may provide competitive grants to state, local, and tribal governments to research, map, assess, and collect data on landslide hazards.

The National Science Foundation shall ensure that landslide research grants are provided on a competitive basis to advance the goals and priorities of the national strategy.

The USGS shall establish the 3D Elevation Program and the 3D Elevation Federal Interagency Coordinating Committee. The program shall:

  • provide 3D elevation data coverage for the United States;
  • coordinate and facilitate the collection, dissemination, and use of 3D elevation data among federal agencies and non-federal entities;
  • produce standard, publicly accessible 3D elevation data products for the United States; and
  • promote the collection, dissemination, and use of 3D elevation data among federal, state, local, and tribal governments, communities, institutions of higher education, and the private sector.

The USGS may make grants and enter into cooperative agreements to facilitate the improvement of nationwide coverage of 3D elevation data.