Committees: H.R.1675 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources03/22/2017 Referred to
12/12/2017 Markup by
12/13/2017 Markup by
11/16/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-1035
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources03/29/2017 Referred to
11/30/2017 Hearings by
12/12/2017 Discharged from
House Science, Space, and Technology03/22/2017 Referred to
12/28/2018 Discharged from
House Science, Space, and Technology Subcommittee on Environment04/25/2017 Referred to