There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

FEMA Accountability, Modernization and Transparency Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

FEMA Accountability, Modernization and Transparency Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

FEMA Accountability, Modernization and Transparency Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

FEMA Accountability, Modernization and Transparency Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

FEMA Accountability, Modernization and Transparency Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

FEMA Accountability, Modernization and Transparency Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that the Federal Emergency Management Agency's current efforts to modernize its grant management system includes applicant accessibility and transparency, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
11/21/2017Became Public Law No: 115-87. (TXT | PDF)
11/21/2017Signed by President.
11/15/2017Presented to President.
11/13/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7178)
09/18/2017Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-159.
05/02/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 0 (Roll no. 242).(text: CR H3022)
05/02/2017Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-107.
03/22/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/21/2017Became Public Law No: 115-87. (TXT | PDF)
11/21/2017Signed by President.
11/15/2017HousePresented to President.
11/14/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/13/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7178)
09/18/2017SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 223.
09/18/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 115-159.
07/26/2017SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/03/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
05/02/2017-2:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/02/2017-2:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 0 (Roll no. 242). (text: CR H3022)
05/02/2017-2:38pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3026)
05/02/2017-1:53pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/02/2017-1:44pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1679.
05/02/2017-1:44pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3022)
05/02/2017-1:44pmHouseMr. Barletta moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/02/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 63.
05/02/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-107.
03/29/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/29/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/29/2017HouseSubcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Discharged.
03/23/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
03/22/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
03/22/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/22/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Transportation and Infrastructure03/22/2017 Referred to
03/29/2017 Markup by
05/02/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-107
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management03/23/2017 Referred to
03/29/2017 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/03/2017 Referred to
07/26/2017 Markup by
09/18/2017 Reported by S. Rept. 115-159

No related bill information was received for H.R.1679.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1679. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-87 (11/21/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House passed version is repeated here.)

FEMA Accountability, Modernization and Transparency Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to ensure that the ongoing modernization of the grant systems for the administration of assistance under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act includes:

  • an online interface for applicants to complete application forms, submit materials, and access the status of applications;
  • mechanisms to eliminate duplication of benefits; and
  • a means of sharing information among agencies and with state, local, and tribal governments to eliminate the need to file multiple applications and speed disaster recovery.

FEMA shall deliver the system capabilities in increments or iterations as working components for applicant use.