There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Women's Business Centers Improvements Act of 2018

Short Titles as Introduced

Women's Business Centers Improvements Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Small Business Act to improve the women's business center program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
05/08/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H3802-3805)
03/22/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/09/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
05/08/2018-2:22pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/08/2018-2:22pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3802-3805)
05/08/2018-2:11pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1680.
05/08/2018-2:11pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3801-3806)
05/08/2018-2:11pmHouseMr. Chabot moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/22/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
03/22/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 05/19/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 05/07/2018
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 05/08/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Small Business03/22/2017 Referred to
Senate Small Business and Entrepreneurship05/09/2018 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1680. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/22/2017)

Women's Business Centers Improvements Act of 2017

The bill revises the duties of the Office of Women's Business Ownership and declares it is the Office's mission to assist women entrepreneurs to start, grow, and compete in global markets by providing quality support with access to capital, access to markets, job creation, growth, and counseling.

The Small Business Administration (SBA) shall establish standards for a program to accredit eligible entities receiving a grant to operate one or more women's business centers.

These organizations shall be eligible to apply for such a grant:

  • a tax-exempt charitable organization;
  • a state, regional, or local economic development organization;
  • an institution of higher education;
  • a state-chartered development, credit, or finance corporation; or
  • any combination of these.

Failure to obtain non-federal funding must be for two consecutive years before an eligible entity shall become ineligible for advance disbursements, or for any other SBA-funded project.

An SBA employee shall:

  • make a prior site visit to any grant applicant to ensure that the applicant has sufficient resources to provide the services for which the grant is being made; and
  • conduct an annual review of the entity's compliance with the grant agreement, including a financial examination.

An eligible entity whose review identifies problems shall develop a remedial plan of action for the Office to approve or amend, subject to appeal. The Office shall terminate any grant for failure of compliance with a plan of action.

Upon request by an eligible entity, the SBA may waive, in whole or in part, although not for more than two years, the requirement to obtain non-federal funds for a grant recipient's counseling and training activities.