There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Private Property Rights Protection Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Private Property Rights Protection Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Private Property Rights Protection Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To protect private property rights.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/23/2018Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6610-6612)
07/23/2018Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-859.
03/22/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
07/24/2018SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
07/23/2018-4:14pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/23/2018-4:14pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6610-6612)
07/23/2018-3:40pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1689.
07/23/2018-3:40pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6610-6616)
07/23/2018-3:40pmHouseMr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
07/23/2018HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 666.
07/23/2018HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-859.
04/25/2018HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/25/2018HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/06/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/22/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/22/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43]* 03/22/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8]* 03/22/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/22/2017 Referred to
04/25/2018 Markup by
07/23/2018 Reported by H. Rept. 115-859
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice04/06/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary07/24/2018 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1689.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1689. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (07/23/2018)

Private Property Rights Protection Act of 2017

This bill prohibits a state or political subdivision from exercising its power of eminent domain, or allowing the exercise of such power by delegation, over property to be used for economic development or over property that is used for economic development within seven years after that exercise, if the state or political subdivision receives federal economic development funds during any fiscal year in which the property is so used or intended to be used.

The bill also prohibits the federal government from exercising its power of eminent domain for economic development.

Private property owners or tenants suffering injury as a result of a violation of this bill may: (1) bring private actions, or (2) notify the Department of Justice (DOJ). DOJ must investigate notices of alleged violations, provide the government authority with 90 days to cure any violations that exist, and bring actions to enforce this bill if the government is still in violation after the 90-day period. DOJ must also intervene in private actions if necessary to enforce this bill.

The bill prohibits: (1) state immunity in federal or state court, and (2) actions from being brought after the statute of limitation period of seven years following the conclusion of any condemnation proceedings.

DOJ must disseminate to states and the public information on: (1) the rights of property owners and tenants under this bill, and (2) the federal laws under which federal economic development funds are distributed.

The bill prohibits the federal government, or a state or political subdivision receiving federal economic development funds during any fiscal year, from exercising the power of eminent domain over property of a religious or other nonprofit organization because of the organization's nonprofit or tax-exempt status or any related quality.

If a court determines that a violation of this bill has a disproportionately high impact on the poor or minorities, DOJ must make efforts to locate former owners and tenants to inform them of the violation and any possible remedies.