There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Department of Veterans Affairs Bonus Transparency Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Department of Veterans Affairs Bonus Transparency Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Veterans Affairs Bonus Transparency Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to submit an annual report regarding performance awards and bonuses awarded to certain high-level employees of the Department of Veterans Affairs.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
07/24/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6172)
07/24/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-249.
03/22/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
07/25/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
07/24/2017-7:15pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/24/2017-7:15pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6172)
07/24/2017-7:14pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6198)
07/24/2017-3:43pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Walz objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
07/24/2017-3:37pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1690.
07/24/2017-3:37pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6172-6173)
07/24/2017-3:37pmHouseMr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/24/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 181.
07/24/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-249.
07/19/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/19/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/12/2017HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
07/12/2017HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
06/29/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity
03/22/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/22/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/22/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/22/2017 Referred to
07/19/2017 Markup by
07/24/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-249
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity03/22/2017 Referred to
06/29/2017 Hearings by
07/12/2017 Markup by
07/12/2017 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs07/25/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1690. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (07/24/2017)

Department of Veterans Affairs Bonus Transparency Act

(Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), within 120 days after the end of each fiscal year, to submit a report to specified congressional committees on the performance awards and bonuses presented to Regional Office Directors of the VA, Directors of Medical Centers of the VA, Directors of Veterans Integrated Service Networks, and any other individual employed in a senior executive position.

Each report shall include:

  • the amount of each award or bonus,
  • the job title of each recipient, and
  • the location where each recipient individual works.