There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Fannie and Freddie Open Records Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Fannie and Freddie Open Records Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Fannie and Freddie Open Records Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require additional entities to be subject to the requirements of section 552 of title 5, United States Code (commonly referred to as the Freedom of Information Act), and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
04/27/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 425 - 0 (Roll no. 233).
04/24/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-93.
03/23/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (34)

Date Chamber All Actions
04/28/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
04/27/2017-3:36pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/27/2017-3:36pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 425 - 0 (Roll no. 233).
04/27/2017-3:26pmHouseThe House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
04/27/2017-3:26pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
04/27/2017-3:26pmHouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1694.
04/27/2017-3:26pmHouseH.Amdt.112 On agreeing to the Johnson (GA) amendment (A002) Agreed to by recorded vote: 410 - 5 (Roll no. 232).
04/27/2017-3:01pmHouseThe House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration.
04/27/2017-3:01pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2923-2925)
04/27/2017-2:44pmHouseCommittee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 1694 as unfinished business.
04/27/2017-2:44pmHouseOn motion that the committee rise Agreed to by voice vote.
04/27/2017-2:43pmHouseMr. Ross moved that the committee rise.
04/27/2017-2:43pmHouseH.Amdt.113 On agreeing to the Clay amendment Agreed to by voice vote.
04/27/2017-2:40pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 280, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Clay amendment No. 3.
04/27/2017-2:40pmHouseH.Amdt.113 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Clay. (consideration: CR H2922-2923; text: CR H2922-2923)
04/27/2017-2:39pmHousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Johnson(GA) amendment No. 2, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Clay demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceeding until a time to be announced.
04/27/2017-2:37pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 280, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Johnson (GA) amendment No. 2.
04/27/2017-2:37pmHouseH.Amdt.112 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Johnson (GA). (consideration: CR H2922, S2923-2924; text: CR H2922)
04/27/2017-2:36pmHouseH.Amdt.111 On agreeing to the Ross amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
04/27/2017-2:33pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 280, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Ross amendment No. 1.
04/27/2017-2:33pmHouseH.Amdt.111 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Ross. (consideration: CR H2921-2922; text: CR H2921-2922)
04/27/2017-2:20pmHouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1694.
04/27/2017-2:18pmHouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable Doug Collins to act as Chairman of the Committee.
04/27/2017-2:18pmHouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 280 and Rule XVIII.
04/27/2017-2:18pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 1694 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. It shall be in order at any time through the legislative day of April 29, 2017, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules.
04/27/2017-2:18pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 280. (consideration: CR H2920-2923; text of the amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR H2922)
04/27/2017-2:08pmHouseRule H. Res. 280 passed House.
04/26/2017-4:53pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 280 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1694 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Specified amendments are in order. It shall be in order at any time through the legislative day of April 29, 2017, for the Speaker to entertain motions that the House suspend the rules.
04/24/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 53.
04/24/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-93.
03/28/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/28/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Oversight and Government Reform
03/23/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
03/23/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform03/23/2017 Referred to
03/28/2017 Markup by
04/24/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-93
Senate Judiciary04/28/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1694. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/27/2017)

Fannie and Freddie Open Records Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill applies the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) to the Federal National Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae) and the Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation (Freddie Mac) during any period either such enterprise is under conservatorship or receivership of the Federal Housing Finance Agency. The FOIA exemption for trade secrets and commercial or financial information shall apply without regard to whether such information was obtained from a person outside Fannie Mae or Freddie Mac.

The FOIA requirements apply to records requests filed after the effective date of this bill that relate to any Fannie Mae or Freddie Mac record created before, on, or after the effective date.

(Sec. 3) To cover the cost of administering FOIA, Fannie Mae and Freddie Mac shall establish fee schedules to collect fees from requests for records intended for a commercial use.