There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Register of Copyrights Selection and Accountability Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Register of Copyrights Selection and Accountability Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Register of Copyrights Selection and Accountability Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 17, United States Code, to provide additional responsibilities for the Register of Copyrights, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
04/26/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 378 - 48 (Roll no. 227).
04/20/2017 Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-91.
03/23/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
04/27/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
04/26/2017-3:33pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/26/2017-3:33pm House On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 378 - 48 (Roll no. 227).
04/26/2017-3:24pm House The House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
04/26/2017-3:23pm House The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1695.
04/26/2017-3:23pm House H.Amdt.109 On agreeing to the Deutch amendment (A001) Agreed to by recorded vote: 410 - 14 (Roll no. 226).
04/26/2017-2:54pm House UNFINISHED BUSINESS - The Chair announced that the unfinished business was the question on adoption of amendments which had been debated earlier and on which further proceedings had been postponed.
04/26/2017-2:53pm House H.Amdt.110 On agreeing to the Chu, Judy amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
04/26/2017-2:47pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 275, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Chu amendment No. 2.
04/26/2017-2:47pm House H.Amdt.110 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Chu, Judy. (consideration: CR H2875-2876; text: CR H2875)
04/26/2017-2:46pm House POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Deutch amendment, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Goodlatte demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings on the question of adoption of the amendment until later in the legislative day.
04/26/2017-2:40pm House DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 275, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Deutch amendment No. 1.
04/26/2017-2:40pm House H.Amdt.109 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Deutch. (consideration: CR H2874-2875, S2876; text CR H2874)
04/26/2017-1:56pm House GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1695.
04/26/2017-1:56pm House House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 275 and Rule XVIII.
04/26/2017-1:56pm House The Speaker designated the Honorable Michael K. Simpson to act as Chairman of the Committee.
04/26/2017-1:56pm House Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1695 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. The resolution makes in order an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-13.
04/26/2017-1:56pm House Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 275. (consideration: CR H2868-2877; text of measure as reported in House: CR H2874)
04/26/2017-1:53pm House Rule H. Res. 275 passed House.
04/25/2017-7:16pm House Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 275 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1695 with 1 hour of general debate. Motion to recommit with or without instructions allowed. The resolution makes in order an amendment in the nature of a substitute consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 115-13.
04/20/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 51.
04/20/2017 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-91.
Action By: House Judiciary
03/29/2017 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 1.
Action By: House Judiciary
03/29/2017 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary
03/23/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/23/2017 House Introduced in House

Cosponsors (33)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9]* 03/23/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/23/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 03/28/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/05/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/05/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/12/2017
Cosponsors Who Withdrew Date Sponsored Date Withdrawn CR Explanation
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/23/2017 03/27/2017 H2456

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/23/2017 Referred to
03/29/2017 Markup by
04/20/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-91
Senate Rules and Administration04/27/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (2)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (7)

  • Advisory bodies
  • Congressional agencies
  • Congressional oversight
  • Federal officials
  • Intellectual property
  • Library of Congress

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1695. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (04/26/2017)

Register of Copyrights Selection and Accountability Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends federal copyright law to require the President, with the advice and consent of the Senate, to appoint a Register of Copyrights from a list of at least three individuals recommended by a panel composed of:

  • the Speaker of the House of Representatives;
  • the President pro tempore of the Senate;
  • the majority and minority leaders of the House and the Senate; and
  • the Librarian of Congress.

(Currently, the Register of Copyrights is appointed by the Librarian of Congress.)

To be eligible for appointment, the individual must be a citizen of the United States with a professional background and experience in copyright law and must be capable of identifying and supervising a chief information officer responsible for managing modern information technology systems.

The bill limits the term of office for the Register of Copyrights to 10 years, but the individual may be reappointed subject to the same requirements established in this bill.

The President may remove the Register of Copyrights from office and must notify both chambers of Congress of any such removal.

(Sec. 3) Nothing in this bill may be construed to impact the mandatory deposit requirements under which owners of a copyright or of an exclusive right of publication must deposit in the U.S. Copyright Office two copies or phonorecords of works published in the United States for the use or disposition of the Library of Congress.