There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Preserving Access to Manufactured Housing Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Preserving Access to Manufactured Housing Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Preserving Access to Manufactured Housing Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Truth in Lending Act to modify the definitions of a mortgage originator and a high-cost mortgage, to amend the Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act of 2008 to modify the definition of a loan originator, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/01/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by recorded vote: 256 - 163 (Roll no. 651).(text: CR H9573)
11/21/2017Reported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-416.
03/23/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
12/04/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
12/01/2017-11:11amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/01/2017-11:11amHouseOn passage Passed by recorded vote: 256 - 163 (Roll no. 651). (text: CR H9573)
12/01/2017-11:00amHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 193 - 227 (Roll no. 650).
12/01/2017-10:28amHouseFloor summary: DEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Waters, Maxine (CA) motion to recommit with instructions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to report the same back to the House forthwith with an amendment to protect consumers from excessive costs and predatory lenders.
12/01/2017-10:27amHouseMs. Waters, Maxine moved to recommit with instructions to the Committee on Financial Services. (text: CR H9583)
12/01/2017-9:17amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1699.
12/01/2017-9:16amHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4182 and H.R. 1699. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4182 under a structured rule, with one hour of general debate, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Resolution also provides for consideration of H.R. 1699 under a closed rule, with one hour of general debate, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
12/01/2017-9:16amHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 635. (consideration: CR H9573-9585)
11/30/2017-2:16pmHouseRule H. Res. 635 passed House.
11/29/2017-5:19pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 635 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4182 and H.R. 1699. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 4182 under a structured rule, with one hour of general debate, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions. Resolution also provides for consideration of H.R. 1699 under a closed rule, with one hour of general debate, and one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
11/21/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 308.
11/21/2017HouseReported by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 115-416.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/12/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 42 - 18.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/12/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
10/11/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
03/23/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
03/23/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 04/28/2017
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 04/28/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 04/28/2017
Rep. Kelly, Trent [R-MS-1] 04/28/2017
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 05/01/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 05/01/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/01/2017
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2] 05/16/2017
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/16/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 05/16/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/17/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/24/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/25/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/25/2017
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 06/08/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/08/2017
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 06/21/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/21/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 06/23/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/27/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/27/2017
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 06/27/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/27/2017
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 06/27/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/27/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/28/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 06/28/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 06/29/2017
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/29/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/29/2017
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 07/11/2017
Rep. Garrett, Thomas A., Jr. [R-VA-5] 07/11/2017
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 07/12/2017
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 07/12/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 07/12/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 07/12/2017
Rep. Buck, Ken [R-CO-4] 07/13/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 07/13/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/13/2017
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/13/2017
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/24/2017
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/27/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/27/2017
Rep. Knight, Stephen [R-CA-25] 07/27/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/27/2017
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 09/13/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/14/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/26/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 09/27/2017
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 10/11/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 10/11/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 10/19/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 10/19/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 10/19/2017
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 10/19/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 10/19/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 10/19/2017
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 10/23/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services03/23/2017 Referred to
10/12/2017 Markup by
11/21/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-416
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs12/04/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1699. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/01/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The expanded summary of the House reported version is repeated here.)

Preserving Access to Manufactured Housing Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Truth in Lending Act (TILA) to specify that a retailer of manufactured housing is generally not a "mortgage originator" subject to requirements under that Act. Similarly, the bill amends the Secure and Fair Enforcement for Mortgage Licensing Act of 2008 to specify that such a retailer is generally not a "loan originator" subject to requirements under that Act.

(Sec. 3) In addition, the bill increases the annual percentage rates and transaction values at which mortgages for certain dwellings are considered "high-cost mortgages" under TILA.