There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

MAR-A-LAGO Act
Making Access Records Available to Lead American Government Openness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the disclosure of certain visitor access records.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/23/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/23/2017Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/23/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (61)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/23/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/23/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/28/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 03/28/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 03/28/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/28/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 03/28/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/28/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/28/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/28/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/28/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 03/28/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 03/28/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 03/28/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/28/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/28/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 03/29/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/29/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 03/29/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 03/29/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/29/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/29/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 04/03/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 04/03/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/03/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 04/03/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/20/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 04/20/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/20/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/20/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 04/25/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/25/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 04/25/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 04/25/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 04/25/2017
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 04/26/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 04/27/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/02/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 05/16/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 05/16/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/16/2017
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen [D-HI-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/17/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/18/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/18/2017
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 05/23/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 06/13/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/13/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government03/23/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1711. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/23/2017)

Making Access Records Available to Lead American Government Openness Act or the MAR-A-LAGO Act

This bill directs the President to establish and update, every 90 days, a publicly available database that contains records of:

  • the name of each visitor at the White House, residence of the Vice-President, or any other location at which the President or Vice President regularly conducts official business (covered location);
  • the name of each individual with whom the visitor met at the covered location; and
  • the purpose of the visit.

The President shall not include in the database any such record: (1) the posting of which would implicate personal privacy or law enforcement concerns or threaten national security, or (2) relating to a purely personal guest at a covered location.

For a particularly sensitive meeting, the President shall: (1) include in the database the number of visitors at the covered location, and (2) post the applicable records in the database when their release is no longer sensitive.