There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act

Short Titles as Introduced

John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to acquire approximately 44 acres of land in Martinez, California, for inclusion in the John Muir National Historic Site, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to acquire approximately 44 acres of land in Martinez, California, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
06/22/2018Became Public Law No: 115-191. (TXT | PDF)
06/22/2018Signed by President.
06/11/2018Presented to President.
06/06/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3263-3264)
07/11/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 15 (Roll no. 346).(text: CR H5408)
07/11/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-208.
03/24/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
06/22/2018Became Public Law No: 115-191. (TXT | PDF)
06/22/2018Signed by President.
06/11/2018HousePresented to President.
06/07/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/06/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3263-3264)
07/13/2017SenateReceived in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 172.
07/12/2017-7:17pmHouseMr. McClintock asked unanimous consent that the Clerk be authorized to make technical corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1719, to include addition of an enacting clause. Agreed to without objection.
07/11/2017-7:10pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
07/11/2017-7:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/11/2017-7:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 401 - 15 (Roll no. 346). (text: CR H5408)
07/11/2017-7:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5418-5419)
07/11/2017-5:08pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
07/11/2017-5:01pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1719.
07/11/2017-5:01pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5408-5409)
07/11/2017-5:01pmHouseMr. LaHood moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/11/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 145.
07/11/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-208.
06/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
06/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
04/03/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/24/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/24/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/24/2017 Referred to
06/27/2017 Markup by
07/11/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-208
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands04/03/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.1719. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-191 (06/22/2018)

John Muir National Historic Site Expansion Act

(Sec. 3) The Department of the Interior may acquire by donation approximately 44 acres of land to include in the John Muir National Historic Site in Martinez, California.

The acquired land shall be administered as part of such site.