There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To restore the Free Speech and First Amendment rights of churches and exempt organizations by repealing the 1954 Johnson Amendment.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
01/03/2017Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 01/11/2017
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 01/29/2018
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/29/2018
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 04/11/2018
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 06/07/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means01/03/2017 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.172.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.172. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2017)

This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal the prohibition against churches and other tax-exempt organizations participating in political campaigns or supporting or opposing candidates for public office. The bill specifies that provisions of the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 are not invalidated or limited by the repeal.