There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to designate at least one city in the United States each year as an "American World War II City", and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/24/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
09/13/2017Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
03/24/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/24/2017Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/24/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 04/03/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/03/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 04/12/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/28/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/24/2017 Referred to
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs03/24/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Hearings by

As of 10/15/2018 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1721 - To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to designate at least one city in the United States each year as an "American World War II City", and for other purposes..


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1721. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/24/2017)

This bill directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to designate at least one city in the United States each year as an "American World War II City" based on the city's: (1) contributions to the war effort during World War II; and (2) efforts to preserve the history of such contributions, including through establishment of preservation organizations or museums, restoration of World War II facilities, and recognition of World War II veterans.

The bill designates Wilmington, North Carolina, as the first such city.