There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Religiously Affiliated Institutions Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Protecting Religiously Affiliated Institutions Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Combating Anti-Semitism Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 18, United States Code, to provide for the protection of community centers with religious affiliation, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/11/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 2 (Roll no. 673).(text: CR H9773-9774)
12/11/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-456.
03/27/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
12/12/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
12/11/2017-7:00pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2017-7:00pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 2 (Roll no. 673). (text: CR H9773-9774)
12/11/2017-6:53pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9778-9779)
12/11/2017-5:55pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/11/2017-5:26pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1730.
12/11/2017-5:26pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9773-9777)
12/11/2017-5:26pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
12/11/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 338.
12/11/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-456.
11/02/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
11/02/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
03/30/2017HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E2578)
03/27/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/27/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/27/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6]* 03/27/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22]* 03/27/2017
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/27/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4]* 03/27/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/27/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/04/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/04/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 04/04/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/06/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 04/25/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/25/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/25/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 05/01/2017
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 05/01/2017
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 05/01/2017
Rep. Curbelo, Carlos [R-FL-26] 05/01/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 05/08/2017
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/08/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Hill, J. French [R-AR-2] 05/18/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 05/19/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/19/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 05/23/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/23/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 06/06/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 06/15/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 07/24/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/28/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/12/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/12/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/12/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 09/26/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/03/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 10/24/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/01/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 11/01/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/02/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/02/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 11/02/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 11/03/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 11/09/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/29/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/29/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/29/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 12/11/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 12/11/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 12/11/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 12/11/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 12/11/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/27/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by
12/11/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-456
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations03/27/2017 Referred to
Senate Judiciary12/12/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1730. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/27/2017)

Combating Anti-Semitism Act of 2017

This bill amends the federal criminal code to modify prohibitions with respect to intentionally defacing, damaging, or destroying religious real property.

Specifically, the bill broadens the scope of prohibited conduct to also criminalize threats to deface, damage, or destroy religious real property.

Additionally, it establishes a criminal penalty—a fine, a prison term of up to five years, or both—for a violation that results in damage or destruction to religious property.

Finally, the bill broadens the definition of "religious real property" to include real property owned or leased by a nonprofit, religiously affiliated organization.