There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Opening Doors for Youth Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide at-risk and disconnected youth with subsidized summer and year-round employment and to assist local community partnerships in improving high school graduation and youth employment rates, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/28/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/28/2017Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/28/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (65)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/28/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Lawrence, Brenda L. [D-MI-14]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Lawson, Al, Jr. [D-FL-5]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large]* 03/28/2017
Rep. Espaillat, Adriano [D-NY-13] 04/03/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/03/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/25/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/25/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 04/25/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 04/27/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 07/11/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/11/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/12/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 07/18/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 08/04/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/08/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/10/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce03/28/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1748. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/28/2017)

Opening Doors for Youth Act of 2017

This bill requires the Department of Labor to provide funding to states for the development or expansion of summer and year-round youth employment programs that: (1) match youth participants with appropriate employers for high-quality employment opportunities; and (2) provide work-readiness training and educational programs, coaching and mentoring, career and college planning services, financial literacy education, and supportive services.

In addition, Labor must award grants to assist community partnerships in improving high school graduation and youth employment rates.

The bill establishes labor standards, performance accountability measures, and reporting requirements with respect to each of these new programs.