There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Miners Protection Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Surface Mining Control and Reclamation Act of 1977 to transfer certain funds to the Multiemployer Health Benefit Plan and the 1974 United Mine Workers of America Pension Plan, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/03/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
02/10/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2017Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/03/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (78)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Bost, Mike [R-IL-12]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/03/2017
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 01/09/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 01/09/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/30/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 02/03/2017
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 02/03/2017
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 02/13/2017
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/13/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/13/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 02/15/2017
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 02/16/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 02/16/2017
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 02/16/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 02/17/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 02/17/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 02/28/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/28/2017
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 02/28/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/01/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/01/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/08/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 03/08/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/16/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/16/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 03/16/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/16/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/16/2017
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/16/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/16/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/21/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 03/21/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/21/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 03/21/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 03/21/2017
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/21/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/22/2017
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/22/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 03/22/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/27/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/29/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 03/29/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 03/30/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 04/04/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 04/05/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/05/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 04/06/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/06/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 04/20/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/20/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 04/20/2017
Rep. Brooks, Mo [R-AL-5] 04/20/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/26/2017
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/26/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/26/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/26/2017
Rep. Katko, John [R-NY-24] 05/02/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 05/02/2017
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 05/04/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 05/04/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/04/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/11/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/11/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/11/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/11/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/11/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/17/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/22/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 05/22/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 05/23/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/12/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 08/22/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 11/08/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/07/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources01/03/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources02/10/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means01/03/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.179. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/03/2017)

Miners Protection Act of 2017

This bill amends the Surface Mining Control and Reclamation Act of 1977 (SMCRA) to transfer certain funds to the Multiemployer Health Benefit Plan and the 1974 United Mine Workers of America (UMWA) Pension Plan to provide health and pension benefits to retired coal miners and their families.

The bill expands the group whose retiree health benefits are taken into account in determining the amount that the Department of the Treasury must transfer from the Abandoned Mine Reclamation Fund and the General Fund of the Treasury to the Multiemployer Health Benefit Plan.

A voluntary employees' beneficiary association (VEBA) established as a result of certain bankruptcy proceedings must transfer to the plan any amounts received as a result of the bankruptcy proceeding, reduced by the amount of the VEBA's administrative costs. Transfers by Treasury are reduced by the amount of the VEBA transfers.

Treasury must also transfer additional funds to the 1974 UMWA Pension Plan to pay pension benefits required under that plan if the amounts available for transfer under SMCRA's $490 million annual limit exceed the amounts required to be transferred for other purposes (including to the UMWA Health Plans).

The bill also: (1) prohibits the pension plan from making certain changes to benefits during any year in which a transfer is received, and (2) establishes additional reporting requirements for the plan.

The bill repeals requirements for current and former signatories to labor agreements with the UMWA to pay unassigned beneficiaries premiums or backstop premiums if transfers under SMCRA are less than the amount required to be transferred.