There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Improving Support for Missing and Exploited Children Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

Improving Support for Missing and Exploited Children Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Improving Support for Missing and Exploited Children Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend and improve the Missing Children's Assistance Act, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
05/23/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4453-4454)
05/04/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 115-110.
03/30/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber All Actions
05/24/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
05/23/2017-2:38pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/23/2017-2:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4453-4454)
05/23/2017-2:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1808.
05/23/2017-2:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4453-4457)
05/23/2017-2:10pmHouseMr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
05/04/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 64.
05/04/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and the Workforce. H. Rept. 115-110.
04/04/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/04/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
03/30/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
03/30/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (19)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce03/30/2017 Referred to
04/04/2017 Markup by
05/04/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-110
Senate Judiciary05/24/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1808. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (05/23/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on May 4, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Improving Support for Missing and Exploited Children Act of 2017

(Sec. 2) This bill amends the Missing Children's Assistance Act to revise the findings to, among other things, specify that the growing numbers of children who are victims of child sexual exploitation include victims of child sex trafficking and sextortion.

(Sec. 3) The bill revises the definition of "missing child" to mean an individual under 18 years of age whose whereabouts are unknown to the individual's parent (currently, legal custodian). It specifies that a parent includes a legal guardian or an individual who functions as a parent (e.g., a grandparent).

(Sec. 4) It revises existing functions and duties of the National Center on Missing and Exploited Children (NCMEC) and adds new requirements for the NCMEC, including to:

  • provide training and technical assistance to help families, law enforcement agencies, and other entities respond to missing foster children and identify, locate, and recover child sex trafficking victims;
  • provide forensic and direct on-site technical assistance, including facial reconstruction of skeletal remains, to help families, law enforcement agencies, and other entities identify deceased children;
  • provide training, technical assistance, and information to help law enforcement agencies and nongovernmental organizations identify and locate non-compliant sex offenders; and
  • develop and disseminate programs and information on sexting and sextortion to families, law enforcement agencies, and other entities.

(Sec. 6) The NCMEC must make publicly available the annual report on missing children and the incidence of attempted child abductions.