There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

HOPS Act
Homeland Production Security Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 to prohibit the use of funds appropriated to the Department of Homeland Security for the procurement of uniforms not manufactured in the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/30/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/11/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/30/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/30/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (40)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Correa, J. Luis [D-CA-46]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 04/26/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 05/01/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 05/01/2017
Rep. Hurd, Will [R-TX-23] 05/01/2017
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/01/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 05/01/2017
Rep. Marshall, Roger W. [R-KS-1] 05/01/2017
Rep. Mast, Brian J. [R-FL-18] 05/01/2017
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 05/01/2017
Rep. Smucker, Lloyd [R-PA-16] 05/01/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 05/01/2017
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 05/01/2017
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/01/2017
Rep. Hollingsworth, Trey [R-IN-9] 05/17/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 05/17/2017
Rep. Higgins, Clay [R-LA-3] 05/17/2017
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 05/17/2017
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 05/17/2017
Rep. Cheney, Liz [R-WY-At Large] 05/17/2017
Rep. Lewis, Jason [R-MN-2] 05/17/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/17/2017
Rep. Bergman, Jack [R-MI-1] 05/23/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/23/2017
Rep. Stefanik, Elise M. [R-NY-21] 05/25/2017
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 06/07/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 06/13/2017
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 06/13/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 06/23/2017
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 06/28/2017
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/11/2017
Rep. Poliquin, Bruce [R-ME-2] 07/24/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/24/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 09/26/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 09/26/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 10/19/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 11/01/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/13/2017
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/15/2017
Rep. Gallagher, Mike [R-WI-8] 11/15/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/30/2017 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Oversight and Management Efficiency04/11/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 11/23/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1811 - HOPS Act.

Subjects (6)

  • Appropriations
  • Buy American requirements
  • Department of Homeland Security
  • Executive agency funding and structure
  • Public contracts and procurement

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1811. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/30/2017)

Homeland Production Security Act or the HOPS Act

This bill amends the American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 to prohibit the use of funds appropriated to the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) for the procurement of DHS uniforms not manufactured in the United States.