There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Big Cat Public Safety Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Lacey Act Amendments of 1981 to clarify provisions enacted by the Captive Wildlife Safety Act, to further the conservation of certain wildlife species, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/30/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/11/2017 Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/30/2017 Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/30/2017 Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (93)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/30/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/30/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/16/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/16/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/16/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/16/2017
Rep. O'Halleran, Tom [D-AZ-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/16/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/16/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/16/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/16/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Tenney, Claudia [R-NY-22] 05/16/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/16/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/16/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/16/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/16/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/16/2017
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/16/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/16/2017
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/16/2017
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/16/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/16/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/16/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 05/16/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 05/16/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/16/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/16/2017
Rep. Costello, Ryan A. [R-PA-6] 05/16/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/16/2017
Rep. Donovan, Daniel M., Jr. [R-NY-11] 05/16/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/16/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/16/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/16/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/25/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/25/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/25/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/25/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/25/2017
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/25/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 05/25/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/25/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/25/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 05/25/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 06/15/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/15/2017
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8] 06/15/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 06/15/2017
Rep. Comstock, Barbara [R-VA-10] 06/15/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 06/15/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/15/2017
Rep. Trott, David A. [R-MI-11] 06/15/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 06/15/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/15/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 06/15/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/15/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/15/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 07/28/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/28/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 07/28/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/28/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/28/2017
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/28/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 07/28/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 07/28/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 08/29/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 08/29/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 08/29/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 08/29/2017
Rep. McSally, Martha [R-AZ-2] 08/29/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 08/29/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 08/29/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 08/29/2017
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 09/28/2017
Rep. Zeldin, Lee M. [R-NY-1] 09/28/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/28/2017
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/28/2017
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/28/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 09/28/2017
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 10/19/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 10/19/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 10/19/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 11/09/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 11/09/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 11/09/2017

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/30/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands04/11/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (0)

As of 11/24/2017 no related bill information has been received for H.R.1818 - Big Cat Public Safety Act.

Subjects (6)

  • Animal protection and human-animal relationships
  • Crimes against animals and natural resources
  • Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
  • Trade restrictions
  • Wildlife conservation and habitat protection

Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1818. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/30/2017)

Big Cat Public Safety Act

This bill amends the Lacey Act Amendments of 1981 to prohibit any person from breeding or possessing prohibited wildlife species (i.e., any live species of lion, tiger, leopard, cheetah, jaguar, or cougar or any hybrid of such species). Breeding means facilitating propagation or reproduction (whether intentionally or negligently), or failing to prevent propagation or reproduction.

The bill revises the list of entities that are exempt from Lacey Act prohibitions regarding those wildlife species to include: (1) certain entities that hold Class C licenses in good standing under the Animal Welfare Act, and (2) current owners of animals that were born before this bill's enactment if the animals are registered with the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service. Those entities and owners may not allow direct contact between the public and the prohibited wildlife species.

A person who knowingly violates the prohibition must be fined not more than $20,000, or imprisoned for not more than five years, or both. The bill considers each violation to be a separate offense. The offense must be deemed to have been committed not only in the district where the violation first occurred, but also in any district in which the defendant may have taken or been in possession of the prohibited wildlife species.

The bill extends forfeiture provisions to fish, wildlife, or plants that are bred or possessed.