There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Ambulatory Surgical Center Quality and Access Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title XVIII of the Social Security Act to modernize payments for ambulatory surgical centers under the Medicare program, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/30/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
04/12/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
03/31/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
03/30/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/30/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/30/2017Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/30/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/30/2017
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/06/2017
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/25/2017
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 04/26/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/27/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/28/2017
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/03/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/11/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 05/11/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/17/2017
Rep. Westerman, Bruce [R-AR-4] 05/17/2017
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/25/2017
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 06/12/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 06/13/2017
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 06/15/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 06/20/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/20/2017
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/20/2017
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 06/21/2017
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-21] 06/21/2017
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/28/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/11/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 07/18/2017
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 09/26/2017
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 11/13/2017
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 12/12/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/06/2018
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 06/12/2018
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/21/2018
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 07/10/2018
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 07/18/2018

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Energy and Commerce03/30/2017 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Health03/31/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means03/30/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Health04/12/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1838. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/30/2017)

Ambulatory Surgical Center Quality and Access Act of 2017

This bill amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to: (1) require the payment system for ambulatory surgical center (ASC) services to feature certain positive annual adjustments equivalent to those made with respect to hospital outpatient department (OPD) services; (2) revise quality reporting requirements to permit publicly available, side-by-side comparisons of quality measures for ASCs and OPDs in the same geographic area; and (3) require the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS), when excluding requested procedures from the list of those approved to be performed in ASCs, to cite specified reasons for doing so.

With respect to excluding procedures from the approved list for ASCs, HHS may not cite as a basis for exclusion that a procedure can only be reported using an unlisted surgical procedure code. (Physicians sometimes use unlisted codes when performing new procedures or services if no existing code is adequately descriptive.)