Text: H.R.184 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Placed on Calendar Senate (07/26/2018)

Calendar No. 528

115th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 184


To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the excise tax on medical devices.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

July 25, 2018

Received; read the first time

July 26, 2018

Read the second time and placed on the calendar


AN ACT

To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the excise tax on medical devices.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Protect Medical Innovation Act of 2018”.

SEC. 2. Repeal of medical device excise tax.

(a) In general.—Chapter 32 of the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 is amended by striking subchapter E.

(b) Conforming amendments.—

(1) Subsection (a) of section 4221 of such Code is amended by striking the last sentence.

(2) Paragraph (2) of section 6416(b) of such Code is amended by striking the last sentence.

(c) Clerical amendment.—The table of subchapters for chapter 32 of such Code is amended by striking the item relating to subchapter E.

(d) Effective date.—The amendments made by this section shall apply to sales after December 31, 2019.

Passed the House of Representatives July 24, 2018.

Attest:
Karen L. Haas,

Clerk  


Calendar No. 528

115th CONGRESS
     2d Session
H. R. 184

AN ACT
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to repeal the excise tax on medical devices.

July 26, 2018
Read the second time and placed on the calendar