Text: H.R.1861 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-322 (12/17/2018)

 
[115th Congress Public Law 322]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]


               THE LARRY DOBY CONGRESSIONAL GOLD MEDAL ACT

[[Page 132 STAT. 4440]]

Public Law 115-322
115th Congress

                                 An Act


 
    To award a Congressional Gold Medal in honor of Lawrence Eugene 
 ``Larry'' Doby in recognition of his achievements and contributions to 
  American major league athletics, civil rights, and the Armed Forces 
      during World War II. <<NOTE: Dec. 17, 2018 -  [H.R. 1861]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: The Larry Doby 
Congressional Gold Medal Act. 31 USC 5111 note.>> 
SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``The Larry Doby Congressional Gold 
Medal Act''.
SEC. 2. FINDINGS.

    Congress finds that--
            (1) Larry Doby was born in Camden, South Carolina, on 
        December 13, 1923, and moved to Paterson, New Jersey, in 1938, 
        where he became a standout four-sport athlete at Paterson 
        Eastside High School;
            (2) Larry Doby attended Long Island University on a 
        basketball scholarship before enlisting in the United States 
        Navy during World War II;
            (3) upon his honorable discharge from the Navy in 1946, 
        Larry Doby played baseball in the Negro National League for the 
        Newark Eagles;
            (4) after playing the 1946 season, Larry Doby's contract was 
        purchased by the Cleveland Indians of the American League on 
        July 3, 1947;
            (5) on July 5, 1947, Larry Doby became the first African-
        American to play in the American League;
            (6) Larry Doby played in the American League for 13 years, 
        appearing in 1,533 games and batting .283, with 253 home runs 
        and 970 runs batted in;
            (7) Larry Doby was voted to seven All-Star teams, led the 
        American League in home runs twice, and played in two World 
        Series;
            (8) in 1948, Larry Doby helped lead the Cleveland Indians to 
        a World Series Championship over the Boston Braves and became 
        the first African-American player to hit a home run in a World 
        Series game;
            (9) after his stellar playing career ended, Larry Doby 
        continued to make a significant contribution to his community;
            (10) Larry Doby was a pioneer in the cause of civil rights 
        and received honorary doctorate degrees from Long Island 
        University, Princeton University, and Fairfield University;

[[Page 132 STAT. 4441]]

            (11) in 1978, Larry Doby became the manager of the Chicago 
        White Sox, only the second African-American manager of a Major 
        League Baseball team;
            (12) Larry Doby was the Director of Community Relations for 
        the New Jersey Nets of the National Basketball Association, 
        where he was deeply involved in a number of inner-city youth 
        programs; and
            (13) Larry Doby was inducted to the National Baseball Hall 
        of Fame in 1998.
SEC. 3. CONGRESSIONAL GOLD MEDAL.

    (a) Presentation Authorized.--The Speaker of the House of 
Representatives and the President pro tempore of the Senate shall make 
appropriate arrangements for the presentation, on behalf of Congress, of 
a gold medal of appropriate design, in honor of Larry Doby and in 
recognition of his achievements and contributions to American major 
league athletics, civil rights, and the Armed Forces during World War 
II.
    (b) Design and Striking.--For the purpose of the presentation 
referred to in subsection (a), the Secretary of the Treasury (referred 
to in this Act as the ``Secretary'') shall strike a gold medal with 
suitable emblems, devices, and inscriptions to be determined by the 
Secretary.
    (c) <<NOTE: Doby, Larry, Jr.>>  Transfer of Medal After 
Presentation.--Following the presentation of the gold medal in honor of 
Larry Doby pursuant to subsection (a), the gold medal shall be given to 
his son, Larry Doby, Jr.
SEC. 4. DUPLICATE MEDALS.

    The Secretary may strike and sell duplicates in bronze of the gold 
medal struck pursuant to section 2 under such regulations as the 
Secretary may prescribe, at a price sufficient to cover the cost 
thereof, including labor, materials, dies, use of machinery, and 
overhead expenses, and the cost of the gold medal.
SEC. 5. STATUS OF MEDALS.

    (a) National Medals.--The medals struck under this Act are national 
medals for purposes of chapter 51 of title 31, United States Code.

[[Page 132 STAT. 4442]]

    (b) Numismatic Items.--For purposes of sections 5134 and 5136 of 
title 31, United States Code, all medals struck under this Act shall be 
considered to be numismatic items.

    Approved December 17, 2018.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 1861:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 164 (2018):
            July 10, considered and passed House.
            Dec. 6, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>