There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Child Welfare Provider Inclusion Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To ensure that organizations with religious or moral convictions are allowed to continue to provide services for children.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/17/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
Action By: Committee on Ways and Means
04/04/2017Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/04/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (113)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9]* 04/04/2017
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 04/04/2017
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12]* 04/04/2017
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/04/2017
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 04/04/2017
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/04/2017
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 04/04/2017
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16]* 04/04/2017
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 04/04/2017
Rep. Palmer, Gary J. [R-AL-6]* 04/04/2017
Rep. Mooney, Alexander X. [R-WV-2]* 04/04/2017
Rep. Grothman, Glenn [R-WI-6]* 04/04/2017
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 04/04/2017
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-11] 04/06/2017
Rep. Hice, Jody B. [R-GA-10] 04/06/2017
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 04/12/2017
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 04/25/2017
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/25/2017
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/27/2017
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/27/2017
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 04/27/2017
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 04/27/2017
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/27/2017
Rep. Rutherford, John H. [R-FL-4] 05/03/2017
Rep. Moolenaar, John R. [R-MI-4] 05/03/2017
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 05/03/2017
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/03/2017
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 05/04/2017
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/18/2017
Rep. Davidson, Warren [R-OH-8] 05/18/2017
Rep. Johnson, Mike [R-LA-4] 05/24/2017
Rep. Babin, Brian [R-TX-36] 06/06/2017
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 06/06/2017
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/15/2017
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/20/2017
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/29/2017
Rep. Emmer, Tom [R-MN-6] 07/11/2017
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/11/2017
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 02/07/2018
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 02/07/2018
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/07/2018
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/07/2018
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 02/07/2018
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 02/07/2018
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14] 02/07/2018
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 02/07/2018
Rep. Loudermilk, Barry [R-GA-11] 02/07/2018
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 02/07/2018
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/13/2018
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 02/13/2018
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 02/13/2018
Rep. Rouzer, David [R-NC-7] 02/14/2018
Rep. Norman, Ralph [R-SC-5] 02/26/2018
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/14/2018
Rep. Dunn, Neal P. [R-FL-2] 03/14/2018
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/14/2018
Rep. Allen, Rick W. [R-GA-12] 03/14/2018
Rep. Banks, Jim [R-IN-3] 03/14/2018
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/14/2018
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 03/20/2018
Rep. LaHood, Darin [R-IL-18] 03/26/2018
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 03/26/2018
Rep. Walker, Mark [R-NC-6] 04/10/2018
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/18/2018
Rep. Bishop, Mike [R-MI-8] 04/27/2018
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/27/2018
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 05/07/2018
Rep. Russell, Steve [R-OK-5] 05/10/2018
Rep. Gaetz, Matt [R-FL-1] 05/10/2018
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/10/2018
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/18/2018
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/18/2018
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/18/2018
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/21/2018
Rep. Love, Mia B. [R-UT-4] 05/21/2018
Rep. Gianforte, Greg [R-MT-At Large] 05/21/2018
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 05/25/2018
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-2] 05/25/2018
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/25/2018
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6] 06/05/2018
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 06/05/2018
Rep. Lesko, Debbie [R-AZ-8] 06/06/2018
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/06/2018
Rep. Estes, Ron [R-KS-4] 06/06/2018
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/14/2018
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/19/2018
Rep. Abraham, Ralph Lee [R-LA-5] 06/19/2018
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/28/2018
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 06/28/2018
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 07/10/2018
Rep. Brat, Dave [R-VA-7] 07/10/2018
Rep. Biggs, Andy [R-AZ-5] 07/10/2018
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/10/2018
Rep. Comer, James [R-KY-1] 07/10/2018
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 07/11/2018
Rep. Jenkins, Evan H. [R-WV-3] 07/13/2018
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 07/13/2018
Rep. Mitchell, Paul [R-MI-10] 07/13/2018
Rep. Bacon, Don [R-NE-2] 07/13/2018
Rep. Ferguson, A. Drew, IV [R-GA-3] 07/17/2018
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/17/2018
Rep. Budd, Ted [R-NC-13] 07/19/2018
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 07/19/2018
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 07/25/2018
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/25/2018
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 08/10/2018
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 08/17/2018
Rep. Kustoff, David [R-TN-8] 09/06/2018
Rep. Rooney, Francis [R-FL-19] 09/13/2018
Rep. Cloud, Michael [R-TX-27] 10/05/2018
Rep. Ratcliffe, John [R-TX-4] 11/02/2018
Rep. Curtis, John R. [R-UT-3] 11/16/2018
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 12/03/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Ways and Means04/04/2017 Referred to
House Ways and Means Subcommittee on Human Resources04/17/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1881. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/04/2017)

Child Welfare Provider Inclusion Act of 2017

This bill prohibits the federal government, and any state or local government that receives federal funding for any program that provides child welfare services under part B (Child and Family Services) or part E (Foster Care and Adoption Assistance) of title IV of the Social Security Act (SSAct), from discriminating or taking an adverse action against a child welfare service provider that declines to provide, facilitate, or refer for a child welfare service that conflicts with the provider's sincerely held religious beliefs or moral convictions.

The bill bars such prohibition from applying to SSAct requirements that forbid state entities from denying or delaying adoption or foster care placements on the basis of an adoptive parent's or a child's race, color, or national origin.

The Department of Health and Human Services must withhold 15% of the federal funds that a state or local government receives for such programs if the state or local government violates this bill.

An aggrieved child welfare service provider may assert such an adverse action violation as a claim or defense in a judicial proceeding and to obtain all appropriate relief (including declaratory relief, injunctive relief, compensatory damages, and reasonable attorney's fees and costs).