There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Udall-Eisenhower Arctic Wilderness Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To preserve the Arctic coastal plain of the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge, Alaska, as wilderness in recognition of its extraordinary natural ecosystems and for the permanent good of present and future generations of Americans.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date All Actions
04/11/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/04/2017Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/04/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (145)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Brian K. [R-PA-8]* 04/04/2017
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/04/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/04/2017
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 05/04/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 05/04/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/04/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/04/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/04/2017
Rep. Barragan, Nanette Diaz [D-CA-44] 05/04/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 05/04/2017
Rep. Jayapal, Pramila [D-WA-7] 05/04/2017
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 05/04/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 05/04/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 05/04/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 05/04/2017
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/04/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 05/04/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/04/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/04/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/04/2017
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/04/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 05/04/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/04/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 05/04/2017
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/04/2017
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/04/2017
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/04/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/04/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/04/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 05/04/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 05/04/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/04/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/04/2017
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/04/2017
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/04/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/04/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/04/2017
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 05/04/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 05/04/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/04/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/04/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 05/04/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 05/04/2017
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13] 05/04/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/04/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/04/2017
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 05/04/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 05/04/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 05/04/2017
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/04/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 05/04/2017
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 05/04/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 05/04/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 05/04/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4] 05/04/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 05/04/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/04/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/04/2017
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 05/04/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/04/2017
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/04/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/04/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 05/04/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/04/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/04/2017
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 05/04/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2] 05/04/2017
Rep. Blunt Rochester, Lisa [D-DE-At Large] 05/04/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/04/2017
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/04/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14] 05/04/2017
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 05/04/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 05/04/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/04/2017
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 05/04/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/04/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2] 05/04/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 05/04/2017
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/04/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/04/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/04/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 05/04/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/04/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/04/2017
Rep. DeSaulnier, Mark [D-CA-11] 05/04/2017
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 05/04/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 05/04/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/04/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 05/04/2017
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 05/04/2017
Rep. Aguilar, Pete [D-CA-31] 05/04/2017
Rep. Soto, Darren [D-FL-9] 05/04/2017
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/16/2017
Rep. Crist, Charlie [D-FL-13] 05/16/2017
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 05/24/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 05/24/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 05/24/2017
Rep. Schneider, Bradley Scott [D-IL-10] 05/24/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 05/24/2017
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 05/24/2017
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 06/02/2017
Rep. Gottheimer, Josh [D-NJ-5] 06/02/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/20/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/20/2017
Rep. Suozzi, Thomas R. [D-NY-3] 06/20/2017
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 06/20/2017
Rep. Rice, Kathleen M. [D-NY-4] 06/20/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 06/29/2017
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 06/29/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 06/29/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 07/03/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 07/03/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 07/03/2017
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 07/19/2017
Rep. Kihuen, Ruben J. [D-NV-4] 07/19/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 09/13/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 09/18/2017
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 09/25/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12] 09/25/2017
Rep. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV-3] 09/25/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 09/26/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/27/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 10/03/2017
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/16/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/28/2017
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 12/06/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/11/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 12/11/2017
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 12/13/2017
Rep. Murphy, Stephanie N. [D-FL-7] 12/14/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5] 12/21/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/23/2018
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/13/2018
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10] 08/21/2018
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 11/27/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Natural Resources04/04/2017 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands04/11/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1889. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/04/2017)

Udall-Eisenhower Arctic Wilderness Act

This bill designates approximately 1,559,538 acres of land within Alaska in the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge (ANWR) as a component of the National Wilderness Preservation System.