There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Honoring Hometown Heroes Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Honoring Hometown Heroes Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Honoring Hometown Heroes Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 4, United States Code, to provide for the flying of the flag at half-staff in the event of the death of a first responder in the line of duty.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/18/2017 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 1 (Roll no. 266).
05/15/2017 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-119.
04/04/2017 Introduced in House

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
05/22/2017 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
05/18/2017-4:28pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/18/2017-4:28pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 1 (Roll no. 266). (text: CR 5/16/2017 H4208)
05/18/2017-4:21pm House Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4341-4342)
05/16/2017-4:48pm House At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
05/16/2017-4:35pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1892.
05/16/2017-4:35pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4208-4210)
05/16/2017-4:35pm House Mr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/15/2017 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 72.
05/15/2017 House Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 115-119.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/03/2017 House Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
05/03/2017 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/04/2017 House Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
04/04/2017 House Introduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary04/04/2017 Referred to
05/03/2017 Markup by
05/15/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-119
Senate Judiciary05/22/2017 Referred to

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.

Subjects (6)

  • Commemorative events and holidays
  • First responders and emergency personnel
  • Law enforcement officers
  • National symbols

Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1892. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (05/18/2017)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on May 15, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Honoring Hometown Heroes Act

(Sec. 2) This bill authorizes the governor of a state, territory, or possession of the United States or the Mayor of the District of Columbia to proclaim that the U.S. flag shall be flown at half-staff in the event of the death of a first responder (public safety officer) working in such jurisdiction who dies while serving in the line of duty.