There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National Veterans Memorial and Museum Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Veterans Memorial and Museum Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

National Veterans Memorial and Museum Act

Short Titles as Introduced

National Veterans Memorial and Museum Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Veterans Memorial and Museum Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Veterans Memorial and Museum Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the Veterans Memorial and Museum in Columbus, Ohio, as the National Veterans Memorial and Museum, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (10)

Date Actions Overview
07/17/2018By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-304.
06/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-186. (TXT | PDF)
06/21/2018Signed by President.
06/11/2018Presented to President.
06/06/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S3264)
05/23/2018Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
11/07/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8554)
11/07/2017Committee on Natural Resources discharged.
11/07/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-399, Part I.
04/04/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/17/2018SenateBy Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-304.
06/21/2018Became Public Law No: 115-186. (TXT | PDF)
06/21/2018Signed by President.
06/11/2018HousePresented to President.
06/07/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/06/2018SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3264)
05/23/2018SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 432.
05/23/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
05/17/2018SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
11/08/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
11/07/2017-3:30pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/07/2017-3:30pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8554)
11/07/2017-3:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1900.
11/07/2017-3:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8554-8556)
11/07/2017-3:12pmHouseMr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/07/2017HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 99.
11/07/2017HouseCommittee on Natural Resources discharged.
11/07/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-399, Part I.
11/02/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
11/02/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
09/13/2017HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs
04/12/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/05/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
04/04/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/04/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/04/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (19)


Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Veterans' Affairs04/04/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by
11/07/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-399
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs04/05/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Hearings by
House Natural Resources04/04/2017 Referred to
11/07/2017 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands04/12/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources11/08/2017 Referred to
05/17/2018 Markup by
05/23/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-304

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1900. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-186 (06/21/2018)

National Veterans Memorial and Museum Act

(Sec. 2) This bill designates the veterans memorial and museum currently being constructed in Columbus, Ohio, as the "National Veterans Memorial and Museum."

Such designation may be withdrawn if Congress finds the museum's progress and operation to be unsatisfactory, but no earlier than five years after the museum opens to the public.

As a condition of designation, the director of the museum shall report to Congress regarding: (1) a projected five-year budget, (2) outreach to veterans about the design and contents of the museum, (3) the exhibit decision-making process, (4) organizational structure, (5) bylaws and rules, and (6) organizations that have accredited the museum.