Committees: H.R.1900 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs04/04/2017 Referred to
11/02/2017 Markup by
11/07/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-399
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs04/05/2017 Referred to
09/13/2017 Hearings by
House Natural Resources04/04/2017 Referred to
11/07/2017 Discharged from
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands04/12/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources11/08/2017 Referred to
05/17/2018 Markup by
05/23/2018 Reported by S. Rept. 115-304