Text: H.R.1917 — 115th Congress (2017-2018)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (03/08/2018)


115th CONGRESS
2d Session
H. R. 1917


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

March 8, 2018

Received; read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works


AN ACT

To allow for judicial review of any final rule addressing national emission standards for hazardous air pollutants for brick and structural clay products or for clay ceramics manufacturing before requiring compliance with such rule.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Blocking Regulatory Interference from Closing Kilns Act of 2017”.

SEC. 2. Extending compliance dates (pending judicial review) of rules addressing national emission standards for hazardous air pollutants for brick and structural clay products manufacturing or clay ceramics manufacturing.

(a) Extension of compliance dates.—

(1) EXTENSION.—Each compliance date of any final rule described in subsection (b) is deemed to be extended by the time period equal to the time period described in subsection (c).

(2) DEFINITION.—In this subsection, the term “compliance date” means, with respect to any requirement of a final rule described in subsection (b), the date by which any State, local, or tribal government or other person is first required to comply.

(b) Final rules described.—A final rule described in this subsection is any final rule to address national emission standards for hazardous air pollutants (NESHAP) for brick and structural clay products manufacturing or clay ceramics manufacturing under section 112 of the Clean Air Act (42 U.S.C. 7412), including—

(1) the final rule entitled “NESHAP for Brick and Structural Clay Products Manufacturing; and NESHAP for Clay Ceramics Manufacturing” published at 80 Fed. Reg. 65469 (October 26, 2015);

(2) the final rule entitled “NESHAP for Brick and Structural Clay Products Manufacturing; and NESHAP for Clay Ceramics Manufacturing: Correction” published at 80 Fed. Reg. 75817 (December 4, 2015); and

(3) any final rule that succeeds or amends the rule described in paragraph (1) or (2).

(c) Period described.—The time period described in this subsection is the period of days that—

(1) begins on the date that is 60 days after the day on which notice of promulgation of a final rule described in subsection (b) appears in the Federal Register; and

(2) ends on the date on which judgment becomes final, and no longer subject to further appeal or review, in all actions (including actions that are filed pursuant to section 307 of the Clean Air Act (42 U.S.C. 7607))—

(A) that are filed during the 60 days described in paragraph (1); and

(B) that seek review of any aspect of such rule.

SEC. 3. Step 2 compliance date for standards of performance for new residential wood heaters, new residential hydronic heaters, and forced-air furnaces.

(a) In general.—The Step 2 compliance date (as such term is used in the final rule entitled “Standards of Performance for New Residential Wood Heaters, New Residential Hydronic Heaters and Forced-Air Furnaces” published at 80 Fed. Reg. 13672 (March 16, 2015)) is deemed to be May 15, 2023.

(b) Conforming changes.—Not later than 60 days after the date of enactment of this Act, the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency shall make such technical and conforming changes to rules and guidance documents as may be necessary to implement subsection (a).

Passed the House of Representatives March 7, 2018.

    Attest: karen l. haas,   
    Clerk