There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Nicaragua Human Rights and Anticorruption Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Nicaraguan Investment Conditionality Act (NICA) of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Nicaraguan Investment Conditionality Act (NICA) of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To oppose loans at international financial institutions for the Government of Nicaragua unless the Government of Nicaragua is taking effective steps to hold free, fair, and transparent elections, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/20/2018Became Public Law No: 115-335.
12/20/2018Signed by President.
12/13/2018Presented to President.
12/11/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H10077-10078)
11/27/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/27/2018Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/03/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7700-7702)
04/05/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
12/20/2018Became Public Law No: 115-335.
12/20/2018Signed by President.
12/13/2018HousePresented to President.
12/11/2018-4:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2018-4:09pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H10077-10078)
12/11/2018-4:09pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10077-10078)
11/28/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/27/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/27/2018SenateS.Amdt.4066 Amendment SA 4066 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/27/2018SenateS.Amdt.4066 Amendment SA 4066 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Menendez. (consideration: CR S7143-7144; text: CR S7143-7144) In the nature of a substitute.
11/27/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7143-7144)
11/27/2018SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/04/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
10/03/2017-3:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/03/2017-3:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7700-7702)
10/03/2017-2:43pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1918.
10/03/2017-2:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7700-7704)
10/03/2017-2:42pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
07/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/24/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/24/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
05/18/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/05/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/05/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/05/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/05/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/05/2017 Referred to
07/27/2017 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere05/18/2017 Referred to
House Financial Services04/05/2017 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations10/04/2017 Referred to
11/27/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1918. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/03/2017)

Nicaraguan Investment Conditionality Act (NICA) of 2017

(Sec. 4) This bill directs the President to instruct the U.S. Executive Director at each international financial institution to use U.S. influence to oppose any loan for the government of Nicaragua's benefit, other than for basic human needs or to promote democracy, unless the Department of State certifies that Nicaragua is taking effective steps to:

  • hold free elections overseen by credible domestic and international electoral observers;
  • promote democracy and an independent judicial system and electoral council;
  • strengthen the rule of law;
  • respect the right to freedom of association and expression;
  • combat corruption, including investigating and prosecuting corrupt government officials; and
  • protect the right of political opposition parties, journalists, trade unionists, human rights defenders, and other civil society activists to operate without interference.

The Department of the Treasury shall submit to Congress a report assessing: (1) the effectiveness of the international financial institutions in enforcing applicable program safeguards in Nicaragua, and (2) the effects of specified constitutional and election concerns in Nicaragua on long-term prospects for positive development outcomes there. The President may waive such requirements in the U.S. national interest.

(Sec. 5) The bill requires: (1) the President to direct the U.S. Permanent Representative to the Organization of American States to use U.S. influence to advocate for an Electoral Observation Mission to be sent to Nicaragua in 2017, and (2) the State Department to report on the involvement of senior Nicaraguan government officials in acts of public corruption or human rights violations.