There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Nicaragua Human Rights and Anticorruption Act of 2018

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Nicaraguan Investment Conditionality Act (NICA) of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

Nicaraguan Investment Conditionality Act (NICA) of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Nicaragua Human Rights and Anticorruption Act of 2018

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To oppose loans at international financial institutions for the Government of Nicaragua unless the Government of Nicaragua is taking effective steps to hold free, fair, and transparent elections, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/20/2018Became Public Law No: 115-335. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2018Signed by President.
12/13/2018Presented to President.
12/11/2018Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection.(text: CR H10077-10078)
11/27/2018Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/27/2018Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/03/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7700-7702)
04/05/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (26)

Date Chamber
12/20/2018Became Public Law No: 115-335. (TXT | PDF)
12/20/2018Signed by President.
12/13/2018HousePresented to President.
12/11/2018-4:09pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/11/2018-4:09pmHouseOn motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H10077-10078)
12/11/2018-4:09pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's Table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10077-10078)
11/28/2018SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/27/2018SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
11/27/2018SenateS.Amdt.4066 Amendment SA 4066 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/27/2018SenateS.Amdt.4066 Amendment SA 4066 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Menendez. (consideration: CR S7143-7144; text: CR S7143-7144) In the nature of a substitute.
11/27/2018SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S7143-7144)
11/27/2018SenateSenate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent.
10/04/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
10/03/2017-3:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/03/2017-3:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7700-7702)
10/03/2017-2:43pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1918.
10/03/2017-2:42pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7700-7704)
10/03/2017-2:42pmHouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/24/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
05/24/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/18/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
04/05/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/05/2017HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
04/05/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs04/05/2017 Referred to
07/27/2017 Markup by
House Foreign Affairs Subcommittee on Western Hemisphere05/18/2017 Referred to
House Financial Services04/05/2017 Referred to
Senate Foreign Relations10/04/2017 Referred to
11/27/2018 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1918. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-335 (12/20/2018)

Nicaragua Human Rights and Anticorruption Act of 2018

This bill imposes restrictions and sanctions on institutions and individuals responsible for the Nicaraguan government's violence and infringement of the civil rights of protesters.

The Department of the Treasury shall take action to restrict international financial institutions, including those affiliated with the World Bank Group and the Inter-American Development Bank, from extending financial or technical assistance to Nicaragua's government and to develop policies for future lending that will advance human rights in the country.

The President shall impose sanctions on foreign persons responsible for acts of corruption, significant human rights violations, violence against protesters in Nicaragua, or provided material support to such actions. Sanctions include blocking the assets of sanctioned individuals and barring them from entry into the United States.

The Department of State shall report to Congress about various topics, including Nicaragua's efforts strengthening the rule of law and democratic governance, combatting corruption, and protecting human rights. The President may temporarily waive the sanctions if the State Department certifies that Nicaragua has taken effective steps on these issues. The President may also waive the sanctions if it is in the national interests of the United States to do so.

The bill also directs the State Department devise a strategy for engaging Nicaragua's civil society to strengthen human rights protections and anti-corruption efforts.