There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

African American Civil Rights Network Act of 2017

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

African American Civil Rights Network Act of 2017

Short Titles as Reported to House

African American Civil Rights Network Act of 2017

Short Titles as Introduced

African American Civil Rights Network Act of 2017

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

African American Civil Rights Network Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 54, United States Code, to establish within the National Park Service the African American Civil Rights Network, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
01/08/2018Became Public Law No: 115-104. (TXT | PDF)
01/08/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2017Presented to President.
12/21/2017Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
12/21/2017Senate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8267-8269)
07/26/2017Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H6330)
07/24/2017Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-241.
04/05/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
01/08/2018Became Public Law No: 115-104. (TXT | PDF)
01/08/2018Signed by President.
12/27/2017HousePresented to President.
12/22/2017SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/21/2017SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
12/21/2017SenateSenate Committee on Energy and Natural Resources discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8267-8269)
07/27/2017SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
07/26/2017-2:40pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/26/2017-2:40pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6330)
07/26/2017-2:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1927.
07/26/2017-2:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6330-6331)
07/26/2017-2:30pmHouseMr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
07/24/2017HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 173.
07/24/2017HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-241.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/27/2017HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
06/27/2017HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/17/2017HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/05/2017HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
04/05/2017HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Adams, Alma S. [D-NC-12]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/05/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Dingell, Debbie [D-MI-12]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Gallego, Ruben [D-AZ-7]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Brown, Anthony G. [D-MD-4]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 04/05/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Richmond, Cedric L. [D-LA-2]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Torres, Norma J. [D-CA-35]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 04/05/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Graves, Garret [R-LA-6]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Plaskett, Stacey E. [D-VI-At Large]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Evans, Dwight [D-PA-2]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Demings, Val Butler [D-FL-10]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 04/05/2017
Rep. McEachin, A. Donald [D-VA-4] 06/27/2017

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources04/05/2017 Referred to
06/27/2017 Markup by
07/24/2017 Reported by H. Rept. 115-241
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Federal Lands04/17/2017 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/27/2017 Referred to
12/21/2017 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1927. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 115-104 (01/08/2018)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on July 26, 2017. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

African American Civil Rights Network Act of 2017

(Sec. 3) This bill requires the Department of the Interior to establish within the National Park Service (NPS) a U.S. Civil Rights Network that encompasses: (1) all NPS units and programs that relate to the African American civil rights movement from 1939 through 1968; (2) with the property owner's consent, other federal, state, local, and privately owned properties that relate or have a verifiable connection to such movement and that are included in, or eligible for, the National Register of Historic Places; and (3) other governmental and nongovernmental facilities and programs of an educational, research, or interpretive nature that are directly related to such movement.

In carrying out the network, Interior must: (1) review civil rights movement studies and reports, such as the Civil Rights Framework Study; (2) produce and disseminate educational materials relating to such movement; (3) provide technical assistance; and (4) adopt an official, uniform symbol or device for the Network and issue regulations for the symbol's use.

The network shall expire seven years after enactment of this bill.