There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Supreme Court Ethics Act of 2017

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To require the Supreme Court of the United States to promulgate a code of ethics.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
04/05/2017Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
05/15/2018-7:12pmASSUMING FIRST SPONSORSHIP - Mr. Johnson (GA) asked unanimous consent that he may hereafter be considered as the first sponsor of H.R. 1960, a bill originally introduced by Representative Slaughter of New York, for the purpose of adding cosponsors and requesting reprintings under clause 7 of rule XII. Agreed to without objection.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/26/2017Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
04/05/2017Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/05/2017Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (96)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boyle, Brendan F. [D-PA-13]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-16]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-14]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T. [D-MI-5]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1]* 04/05/2017
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7]* 04/05/2017
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 04/05/2017
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/25/2017
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/25/2017
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/25/2017
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P., III [D-MA-4] 04/25/2017
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/25/2017
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/25/2017
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/25/2017
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/25/2017
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/25/2017
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 04/25/2017
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/25/2017
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/25/2017
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/25/2017
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 04/25/2017
Del. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/25/2017
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 04/25/2017
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 04/25/2017
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/25/2017
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 04/25/2017
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/25/2017
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/25/2017
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 04/25/2017
Rep. Raskin, Jamie [D-MD-8] 04/25/2017
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/25/2017
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/25/2017
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/25/2017
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 04/25/2017
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/25/2017
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/25/2017
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/25/2017
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 04/25/2017
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 04/25/2017
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/25/2017
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/01/2017
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/03/2017
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-22] 05/16/2017
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 05/16/2017
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 05/16/2017
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/16/2017
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/16/2017
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/16/2017
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/16/2017
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 05/16/2017
Rep. Watson Coleman, Bonnie [D-NJ-12] 05/16/2017
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/16/2017
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Beyer, Donald S., Jr. [D-VA-8] 05/16/2017
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/16/2017
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/16/2017
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 05/22/2017
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 06/20/2017
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/29/2017
Rep. Norcross, Donald [D-NJ-1] 09/06/2017
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 10/10/2017
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/23/2018
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 06/01/2018
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/26/2018
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/29/2018
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/18/2018
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/23/2018
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 07/23/2018
Rep. Krishnamoorthi, Raja [D-IL-8] 07/23/2018
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 07/25/2018
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 07/25/2018
Rep. Moulton, Seth [D-MA-6] 07/25/2018
Rep. Lieu, Ted [D-CA-33] 07/26/2018
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/26/2018
Rep. Carbajal, Salud O. [D-CA-24] 08/24/2018
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/20/2018
Rep. Khanna, Ro [D-CA-17] 11/13/2018

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary04/05/2017 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet04/26/2017 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1960. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/05/2017)

Supreme Court Ethics Act of 2017

The bill requires the Supreme Court to promulgate a code of ethics for the Justices of the Supreme Court that shall include the five canons of the Code of Conduct for United States Judges adopted by the Judicial Conference of the United States, with any amendments or modifications that the Supreme Court determines appropriate.